EP2879690 - TARGETED OESOPHAGEAL ADMINISTRATION OF ZN-ALPHA2-GLYCOPROTEINS (ZAG), METHODS AND FORMULATIONS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.07.2019 [2019/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aston University Aston Triangle Birmingham B4 7ET / GB | [2015/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TISDALE, Michael Wellcot Star Lane Claverdon Warwickshire CV35 8LW / GB | 02 /
RUSSELL, Steven 18 Victory Road Wedensbury West Midlands WS10 7RR / GB | [2015/24] | Representative(s) | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | Ruiz Antoli, Soledad Cecilia, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13747684.2 | 31.07.2013 | WO2013GB52039 | Priority number, date | US201261677984P | 31.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261677984 P | [2015/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014020333 | Date: | 06.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2879690 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/17 | [2015/24] | CPC: |
A61K38/1741 (EP,US);
A61K31/138 (EP,US);
A61K38/1709 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K47/56 (EP,US);
A61K9/0053 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] | Title | German: | GEZIELTE ÖSOPHAGEALE VERABREICHUNG VON ZN-ALPHA2-GLYCOPROTEINEN (ZAG), VERFAHREN UND FORMULIERUNGEN DARAUS | [2015/24] | English: | TARGETED OESOPHAGEAL ADMINISTRATION OF ZN-ALPHA2-GLYCOPROTEINS (ZAG), METHODS AND FORMULATIONS THEREOF | [2015/24] | French: | ADMINISTRATION OESOPHAGIENNE CIBLÉE DE ZN-ALPA2-GLYCOPROTÉINES (ZAG), PROCÉDÉS ET FORMULATIONS ASSOCIÉS | [2015/24] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 23.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/29] | 14.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.11.2016 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.09.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 08.09.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.09.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2011161427 (UNIV ASTON [GB], et al) [X] 1-110 * examples 10,12; claim - *; | [A] - RUSSELL STEVEN THOMAS ET AL, "Role of beta-adrenergic receptors in the anti-obesity and anti-diabetic effects of zinc-alpha 2-glycoprotien (ZAG)", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (201204), vol. 1821, no. 4, pages 590 - 599, XP002712623 [A] 1-110 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbalip.2011.12.003 | [A] - DE BOER ROBERT E P ET AL, "The beta-adrenoceptors mediating relation of rat oesophageal muscularis mucosae are predominantly of the beta-3-, but also of the beta-2-subtype", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (1993), vol. 110, no. 1, ISSN 0007-1188, pages 442 - 446, XP002712624 [A] 1-110 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1476-5381.1993.tb13830.x | by applicant | US6890899 | US2006160723 | US7550429 | US2010173829 | - "National Task Force on the Prevention and Treatment of Obesity", ARCH. INTERN. MED., (2000), vol. 160, pages 898 - 904 | - KHAODHIAR, L. ET AL., CLIN. CORNERSTONE, (1999), vol. 2, pages 17 - 31 | - T. ARAKI ET AL., "Complete amino acid sequence of human plasma Zinc-a2-glycoprotein and its homology to histocompatibility antigens", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (1988), vol. 85, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.85.3.679, pages 679 - 683, XP001120556 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.85.3.679 | - H. UEYAMA ET AL., "Cloning and nucleotide sequence of a human Zinc-a2- glycoprotein cDNA and chromosomal assignment of its gene", BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1991), vol. 177, doi:doi:10.1016/0006-291X(91)91844-3, pages 696 - 703, XP024835722 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-291X(91)91844-3 | - UEYAMA ET AL., "Molecular cloning and chromosomal assignment of the gene for human Zinc-a2- glycoprotein", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1993), vol. 32, pages 12968 - 12976 | - H. UEYAMA ET AL., J. BIOCHEM., (1994), vol. 116, pages 677 - 681 | - OHKUBO ET AL., "Purification and characterisation of human plasma Zn-a2-glycoprotein", PREP. BIOCHEM., (1988), vol. 18, pages 413 - 430 | - H. UEYAMA ET AL., "Structure and Expression of Rat and Mouse mRNAs for Zn-a2 -glycoprotein", J. BIOCHEM., (1994), vol. 116, pages 677 - 681, XP009104382 |