EP2877156 - CHONDROITIN COMPLEXES FOR TRANSCUTANEOUS ABSORPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Altergon S.A. Via Dogana Vecchia 2 6900 Lugano / CH | [2020/01] |
Former [2015/23] | For all designated states Altergon S.a. Via Dogana Vecchia 2 6900 Lugano / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE ROSA, Mario c/o ALTERGON S.A. Via Dogana Vecchia 2 6900 Lugano / CH | 02 /
SCHIRALDI, Chiara c/o ALTERGON S.A. Via Dogana Vecchia 2 6900 Lugano / CH | [2015/23] | Representative(s) | Bianchetti & Minoja with Trevisan & Cuonzo IPS SRL Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2015/23] | Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 13747807.9 | 25.07.2013 | [2020/01] | WO2013EP65733 | Priority number, date | IT2012MI01316 | 27.07.2012 Original published format: IT MI20121316 | [2015/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014016380 | Date: | 30.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2877156 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2877156 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/06, A61K9/06, A61K47/36, A61K9/00, A61K47/61, A61K31/196, A61K31/407 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
A61K31/407 (EP,RU,US);
A61K31/196 (EP,RU,US);
A61K47/36 (EP,RU,US);
A61K47/61 (EP,RU,US);
A61K8/735 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,RU,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/23] | A61K9/06, A61K47/36, A61K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHONDROITINKOMPLEXE ZUR TRANSKUTANEN AUFNAHME | [2015/23] | English: | CHONDROITIN COMPLEXES FOR TRANSCUTANEOUS ABSORPTION | [2015/23] | French: | COMPLEXES DE CHONDROÏTINE POUR UNE ABSORPTION TRANSCUTANÉE | [2015/23] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/23] | 28.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2018 | Opposition(s) | 02.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 01.01.2020 | EE | 01.01.2020 | HR | 01.01.2020 | LT | 01.01.2020 | LV | 01.01.2020 | MC | 01.01.2020 | MK | 01.01.2020 | MT | 01.01.2020 | RO | 01.01.2020 | RS | 01.01.2020 | SE | 01.01.2020 | SI | 01.01.2020 | SM | 01.01.2020 | BG | 01.04.2020 | NO | 01.04.2020 | IS | 01.05.2020 | PT | 27.05.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/28] | EE | 01.01.2020 | |
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
MT | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | EE | 01.01.2020 | |
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | EE | 01.01.2020 | |
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | HR | 01.01.2020 | |
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | HR | 01.01.2020 | |
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | HR | 01.01.2020 | |
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | HR | 01.01.2020 | |
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | LT | 01.01.2020 | |
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | LT | 01.01.2020 | |
NO | 01.04.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1582214 (GENEVRIER LAB [FR]) [X] 1-7* page 7; claims 1-10 *; | [X]EP2106798 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [X] 1-7 * pages 7-8; claims 2, 3, 6, 11-13 * | Examination | US2003104601 | EP1582214 | EP2106798 | by applicant | US5639738 | US5792753 | US5852002 | WO0102597 | US6288044 | WO0180810 | EP1282684 | US2003104601 | US2003109693 | JP2004024208 | US6777398 | US2005164984 | US2005266460 | US2006052335 | US2006057697 | US2007015249 | WO2007023867 | US2007059805 | WO2007058252 | US7232676 | WO2007069693 | EP1832662 | US7273729 | WO2007145197 | EP1950308 | WO2010136435 | US2011244520 | - SUGAHARA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1996), vol. 271, pages 26745 - 54 | - SUGUMARAN; SILBERT, J. BIOL. CHEM., (19901025), vol. 265, no. 30, pages 18284 - 8 | - RODRIGUEZ ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1988), vol. 177, pages 117 - 124 | - MANZONI ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (1996), vol. 18, pages 383 - 386 | - "Hyaluronan: Biomedical", BROWN ET AL., Medical and Clinical Aspects, CAMBRIDGE: WOODHEAD PUBLISHERS, (2002), pages 249 - 256 | - BROWN ET AL., Hyaluronan in Drug Delivery, ROYAL SOCIETY OF MEDICINE PRESS, (1995), pages 48 - 52 | - BROWN ET AL., Hyaluronan in Drug Delivery, ROYAL SOCIETY OF MEDICINE PRESS, (1995), pages 53 - 71 | - BROWN ET AL., INT. J. TISSUE REACTIONS- EXP. CLIN. ASPECTS, (1995), vol. 17, pages 133 - 140 | - BROWN; MOORE, Hyaluronan in Drug Delivery, ROYAL SOCIETY OF MEDICINE PRESS, (1996), pages 121 - 131 | - MCEWAN; SMITH, AUST. J. DERM, (1997), vol. 38, pages 187 - 189 | - NAZIR ET AL., PHARM. SCI., (2001), vol. 3, page 1429 | - MCEWAN; SMITH, AUST. J. DERM., (1997), vol. 38, pages 187 - 189 | - WOLF ET AL., INT. J. DERMATOL., (2001), vol. 40, pages 709 - 713 | - LIN; MAIBACH, Hyaluronan in Drug Delivery, R.S. M. PRESS., pages 167 - 174 | - BROWN ET AL., J. INVEST. DERMATOL., (1999), vol. 113, pages 740 - 746 | - "Hyaluronan: Biomedical", BROWN ET AL., Medical and Clinical Aspects, WOODHEAD PUBLISHERS, pages 249 - 256 | - BROWN; MARTIN, INT. J. PHARM., (2001), vol. 225, pages 113 - 121 | - PROC. MILLEN. CONG. PHARMA. SCI., (2000), page A80 | - BROWN ET AL., INTERNATIONAL J. OF PHARMACEUTICS, (2001), vol. 225, pages 113 - 121 |