EP2867560 - TRANSMISSION CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scania CV AB 151 87 Södertälje / SE | [2015/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHANSSON, Oskar Bågljusvägen 5 2 tr nr 222 112 19 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
ÖGREN, Mikael Hallundavägen 143 151 48 Södertälje / SE | 03 /
ROOS, Fredrik Mickelsbergsvägen 334 141 71 Segeltorp / SE | [2017/17] |
Former [2015/19] | 01 /
JOHANSSON, Oskar Bågljusvägen 5 2 tr nr 222 S-112 19 Stockholm / SE | ||
02 /
ÖGREN, Mikael Silverstigen 16 S-151 48 Södertälje / SE | |||
03 /
ROOS, Fredrik Mickelsbergsvägen 334 S-141 71 Segeltorp / SE | Representative(s) | Scania CV AB Patents, GP 117kv 151 87 Södertälje / SE | [2015/19] | Application number, filing date | 13748376.4 | 26.06.2013 | [2017/17] | WO2013SE50768 | Priority number, date | SE20120000389 | 27.06.2012 Original published format: SE 1200389 | [2015/19] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014003652 | Date: | 03.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2867560 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2867560 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/02, B60W30/14, B60W30/18 | [2015/19] | CPC: |
F16H61/0213 (EP,CN,US);
B60W30/18072 (EP,CN,SE,US);
B60W50/0097 (EP,CN,SE,US);
F16H59/18 (US);
F16H59/36 (US);
F16H59/44 (US);
F16H59/66 (EP,CN,US);
F16H59/68 (US);
F16H59/70 (US);
F16H63/42 (US);
B60W10/11 (EP,CN,US);
B60W2030/18081 (EP,CN,US);
B60W2030/1809 (EP,CN,SE,US);
B60W2300/125 (EP,CN,US);
B60W2552/15 (EP,CN,US);
B60W2552/20 (EP,CN,US);
B60W2556/50 (EP,CN,US);
F16H2059/142 (US);
F16H2059/186 (US);
F16H2059/366 (US);
F16H2059/663 (US);
F16H2059/666 (US);
F16H2059/6815 (US);
F16H2061/0216 (US);
F16H2063/426 (US);
F16H2300/02 (US);
Y02T10/60 (EP,US);
Y02T10/84 (CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNGSSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM | [2015/19] | English: | TRANSMISSION CONTROL SYSTEM | [2015/19] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE TRANSMISSION | [2015/19] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/19] | 14.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.06.2013 | AL | 26.04.2017 | AT | 26.04.2017 | CY | 26.04.2017 | CZ | 26.04.2017 | DK | 26.04.2017 | EE | 26.04.2017 | ES | 26.04.2017 | FI | 26.04.2017 | HR | 26.04.2017 | IT | 26.04.2017 | LT | 26.04.2017 | LV | 26.04.2017 | MC | 26.04.2017 | MK | 26.04.2017 | NL | 26.04.2017 | PL | 26.04.2017 | PT | 26.04.2017 | RO | 26.04.2017 | RS | 26.04.2017 | SE | 26.04.2017 | SI | 26.04.2017 | SK | 26.04.2017 | SM | 26.04.2017 | TR | 26.04.2017 | IE | 26.06.2017 | LU | 26.06.2017 | MT | 26.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | BG | 26.07.2017 | NO | 26.07.2017 | GR | 27.07.2017 | IS | 26.08.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 26.06.2013 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MK | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PT | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
TR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 26.06.2017 | ||
LU | 26.06.2017 | ||
MT | 26.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 26.06.2013 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MK | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
TR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 26.06.2017 | ||
LU | 26.06.2017 | ||
MT | 26.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 26.06.2013 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MK | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 26.06.2017 | ||
LU | 26.06.2017 | ||
MT | 26.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 26.06.2013 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 26.06.2017 | ||
LU | 26.06.2017 | ||
MT | 26.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 26.06.2013 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 26.06.2017 | ||
LU | 26.06.2017 | ||
MT | 26.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 26.06.2017 | ||
LU | 26.06.2017 | ||
MT | 26.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 26.06.2017 | ||
LU | 26.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 26.06.2017 | ||
LU | 26.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
LU | 26.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 26.04.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102008023135 (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG [DE]) [A] 1-27 * abstract ** paragraphs [0012] - [0016] - [0018] , [0019] , [0021] - [0023] *; | [A]WO2011075065 (SCANIA CV AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-27 * abstract * * page 11, line 17 - page 12, line 30 * * page 16, lines 5-14 * * page 19, line 24 - page 20, line 23 *; | [A]DE102011109039 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-27 * abstract * * paragraph [0036] * |