EP2867561 - TRANSMISSION CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scania CV AB 151 87 Södertälje / SE | [2015/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHANSSON, Oskar Bågljusvägen 5 2 tr nr 222 112 19 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
ÖGREN, Mikael Hallundavägen 143 151 48 Södertälje / SE | 03 /
ROOS, Fredrik Mickelbergsvägen 334 141 71 Segeltorp / SE | [2017/35] |
Former [2015/19] | 01 /
JOHANSSON, Oskar Bågljusvägen 5 2 tr nr 222 S-112 19 Stockholm / SE | ||
02 /
ÖGREN, Mikael Silverstigen 16 S-151 48 Södertälje / SE | |||
03 /
ROOS, Fredrik Mickelbergsvägen 334 S-141 71 Segeltorp / SE | Representative(s) | Scania CV AB Patents, GP 117kv 151 87 Södertälje / SE | [2015/19] | Application number, filing date | 13748377.2 | 26.06.2013 | [2017/35] | WO2013SE50769 | Priority number, date | SE20120000388 | 27.06.2012 Original published format: SE 1200388 | [2015/19] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014003653 | Date: | 03.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2867561 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2867561 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/02, B60W30/14, B60W30/18 | [2015/19] | CPC: |
B60W30/143 (EP);
B60W30/18072 (EP,SE);
B60W50/0097 (SE);
F16H61/0213 (EP);
B60W10/11 (EP);
B60W2030/18081 (SE);
B60W2030/1809 (SE);
B60W2552/20 (EP);
B60W2720/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNGSSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM | [2015/19] | English: | TRANSMISSION CONTROL SYSTEM | [2015/19] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE TRANSMISSION | [2015/19] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/19] | 14.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 31.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17168579.5 / EP3232092 | EP17168580.3 / EP3255316 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.06.2013 | AL | 30.08.2017 | AT | 30.08.2017 | CY | 30.08.2017 | CZ | 30.08.2017 | DK | 30.08.2017 | EE | 30.08.2017 | ES | 30.08.2017 | FI | 30.08.2017 | HR | 30.08.2017 | IT | 30.08.2017 | LT | 30.08.2017 | LV | 30.08.2017 | MC | 30.08.2017 | MK | 30.08.2017 | NL | 30.08.2017 | PL | 30.08.2017 | PT | 30.08.2017 | RO | 30.08.2017 | RS | 30.08.2017 | SE | 30.08.2017 | SI | 30.08.2017 | SK | 30.08.2017 | SM | 30.08.2017 | TR | 30.08.2017 | BG | 30.11.2017 | NO | 30.11.2017 | GR | 01.12.2017 | IS | 30.12.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 26.06.2013 | |
AT | 30.08.2017 | ||
CY | 30.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
MK | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PT | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
TR | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 26.06.2013 | |
AT | 30.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PT | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
TR | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PT | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
TR | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
TR | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 30.08.2017 | |
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 30.08.2017 | |
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 30.08.2017 | |
NO | 30.11.2017 | Cited in | International search | [YA]DE102008023135 (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG [DE]) [Y] 17,34 * abstract * * paragraph [0024]; claims 1,5,28 * [A] 1; | [YA]WO2011075065 (SCANIA CV AB [SE], et al) [Y] 13,14 * abstract * * claims 1,4,6,7,13,15,16,17 * * page 20, lines 10-23 * [A] 1,2; | [XAY]DE102010030346 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [X] 1-6,10,11,16,18-22,24-33 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] , [0020] , [0021] , [0023] , [0031] , [0048] , [0051] , [0054] * * claims 1, 17 * [A] 7-9,12,15,23 [Y] 13,14,17,34; | [A]DE102011109039 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-34 * abstract ** paragraphs [0012] , [0023] , [0025] , [0034] , [0038] * |