EP2816105 - GREEN SULFUR BACTERIA VARIANT AND BACTERIOCHLOROPHYLL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kurume University 67, Asahi-machi Kurume-shi Fukuoka 830-0011 / JP | [2014/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARADA, Jiro c/o Kurume University 67 Asahi-machi Kurume-shi Fukuoka 830-0011 / JP | 02 /
NOGUCHI, Masato c/o Kurume University 67 Asahi-machi Kurume-shi Fukuoka 830-0011 / JP | 03 /
TAMIAKI, Hitoshi c/o Department of Pharmacy College of Pharmaceutical Sciences Ritsumeikan University 1-1-1 Nojihigashi Kusatsu-shi Shiga 525-8577 / JP | [2014/52] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/14] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2014/52] | Campbell, Patrick John Henry J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13748805.2 | 12.02.2013 | [2018/14] | WO2013JP53295 | Priority number, date | JP20120028919 | 13.02.2012 Original published format: JP 2012028919 | [2014/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013122064 | Date: | 22.08.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2816105 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2816105 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/20, C12N1/21, C12N15/09, C12N9/10, C12P9/00, C12P17/18, C07D487/22, // C12R1/01 | [2015/42] | CPC: |
C07D487/22 (EP,US);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
C12N9/1007 (EP,US);
C12P17/182 (EP,US);
C12R2001/01 (EP,US);
Y02P20/52 (US)
|
Former IPC [2014/52] | C12N1/20, C12N1/21, C12P9/00, C12N15/09 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GRÜNE SCHWEFELBAKTERIENVARIANTEN UND BAKTERIOCHLOROPHYLL | [2014/52] | English: | GREEN SULFUR BACTERIA VARIANT AND BACTERIOCHLOROPHYLL | [2014/52] | French: | VARIANT DE BACTÉRIES SULFUREUSES VERTES ET BACTÉRIOCHOROPHYLLE | [2014/52] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2014 | Translation filed | 12.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 12.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 04.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.02.2013 | AL | 04.04.2018 | AT | 04.04.2018 | CY | 04.04.2018 | CZ | 04.04.2018 | DK | 04.04.2018 | EE | 04.04.2018 | ES | 04.04.2018 | FI | 04.04.2018 | HR | 04.04.2018 | IT | 04.04.2018 | LT | 04.04.2018 | LV | 04.04.2018 | MC | 04.04.2018 | MK | 04.04.2018 | NL | 04.04.2018 | PL | 04.04.2018 | RO | 04.04.2018 | RS | 04.04.2018 | SE | 04.04.2018 | SI | 04.04.2018 | SK | 04.04.2018 | SM | 04.04.2018 | TR | 04.04.2018 | BG | 04.07.2018 | NO | 04.07.2018 | GR | 05.07.2018 | IS | 04.08.2018 | PT | 06.08.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 12.02.2013 | |
AL | 04.04.2018 | ||
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CY | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
TR | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
IS | 04.08.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CY | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
TR | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
IS | 04.08.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CY | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
TR | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
TR | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 04.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY] - MIYATAKE T ET AL, "Self-aggregates of bacteriochlorophylls-c, d and e in a light-harvesting antenna system of green photosynthetic bacteria: Effect of stereochemistry at the chiral 3-(1-hydroxyethyl) group on the supramolecular arrangement of chlorophyllous pigments", JOURNAL OF PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY C: PHOTOCHEMISTRY REVIEWS, (20050801), vol. 6, no. 2-3, ISSN 1389-5567, pages 89 - 107, XP027707342 [I] 6-9 * 4. Self-aggregates of modified unnatural BChls possessing a chiral secondary alcoholic group * [Y] 10 | [Y] - SEIJI TOKITA ET AL, "A novel and mild isolation procedure of chlorosomes from the green sulfur bacterium Chlorobaculum tepidum", PHOTOSYNTHESIS RESEARCH, (20110826), vol. 108, no. 2-3, doi:10.1007/s11120-011-9679-4, ISSN 0166-8595, pages 183 - 190, XP055211138 [Y] 10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11120-011-9679-4 | [Y] - OOSTERGETEL ET AL, "Long-range organization of bacteriochlorophyll in chlorosomes of Chlorobium tepidum investigated by cryo-electron microscopy", FEBS LETTERS, (20071105), vol. 581, no. 28, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 5435 - 5439, XP022374807 [Y] 10 * the whole document * | [A] - J. A. MARESCA ET AL, "The bchU Gene of Chlorobium tepidum Encodes the C-20 Methyltransferase in Bacteriochlorophyll c Biosynthesis", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (20040416), vol. 186, no. 9, doi:10.1128/JB.186.9.2558-2566.2004, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 2558 - 2566, XP055210909 [A] 2-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.186.9.2558-2566.2004 | [A] - HARADA J ET AL, "In vitro activity of C-20 methyltransferase, BchU, involved in bacteriochlorophyll c biosynthetic pathway in green sulfur bacteria", FEBS LETTERS, vol. 579, no. 9, ISSN 0014-5793, (20050302), pages 1983 - 1987, (20050328), XP027696485 [A] 2-7 * the whole document * | [T] - YUSUKE TSUKATANI ET AL, "Bacteriochlorophyll homolog compositions in the bchU mutants of green sulfur bacteria", PHOTOCHEMICAL & PHOTOBIOLOGICAL SCIENCES, (20131001), vol. 12, no. 12, doi:10.1039/c3pp50253h, ISSN 1474-905X, page 2195, XP055210879 [T] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c3pp50253h | [T] - ORF GREGORY S ET AL, "Chlorosome antenna complexes from green photosynthetic bacteria", PHOTOSYNTHESIS RESEARCH, (20130613), vol. 116, no. 2, doi:10.1007/S11120-013-9869-3, ISSN 0166-8595, pages 315 - 331, XP035355276 [T] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11120-013-9869-3 | [T] - DARIUSZ M. NIEDZWIEDZKI ET AL, "Photophysical Properties of the Excited States of Bacteriochlorophyll f in Solvents and in Chlorosomes", THE JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY B, (20140110), vol. 118, no. 9, doi:10.1021/jp409495m, ISSN 1520-6106, pages 2295 - 2305, XP055210899 [T] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jp409495m | International search | [A] - HITOSHI TAMIAKI ET AL., "Synthesis of homologously pure bacteriochlorophyll-e and f analogues from BChls-c/d via transformation of the 7-methyl to formyl group and self- aggregation of synthetic zinc methyl bacteriopheophorbides-c/d/e/f in non-polar organic solvent.", TETRAHEDRON, (2003), vol. 59, pages 4337 - 4350, XP004429347 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(03)00638-0 | [A] - NIKOLAUS RISCH, "Bacteriochlorophyll f. - Partial synthesis and the behavior of some derivatives.", LIEBIGS ANNALEN DER CHEMIE, (1988), vol. 4, pages 343 - 347, XP055164831 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jlac.198819880407 | [A] - HITOSHI TAMIAKI ET AL., "A novel approach toward bacteriochlorophylls-e and f.", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (1999), vol. 9, pages 1631 - 1632, XP004167729 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(99)00258-9 | [A] - SHIN-ICHI SASAKI ET AL., "Self- assembly of synthetic bacteriochlorophyll-f analogues having C8-formyl group", BULLETIN OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (2004), vol. 77, pages 797 - 800, XP008174498 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1246/bcsj.77.797 | [A] - MIN CHEN ET AL., "A red-shifted chlorophyll.", SCIENCE, (2010), vol. 329, pages 1318 - 1319, XP055161830 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1191127 | [A] - HITOSHI TAMIAKI ET AL., "In vitro synthesis and characterization of bacteriochlorophyll-f and its absence in bacteriochlorophyll-e producing organisms.", PHOTOSYNTHESIS RESEARCH, (2011), vol. 107, pages 133 - 138, XP019880444 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11120-010-9603-3 | [A] - HITOSHI TAMIAKI ET AL., "Analysis of Bacteriochlorophyl", LOW TEMPERATURE SCIENCE, (2009), vol. 67, pages 339 - 346, XP008175005 | [XP] - JIRO HARADA ET AL., "A seventh bacterial chlorophyll driving a large light-harvesting antenna.", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (201209), vol. 2, page 671, XP055161838 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep00671 | [XP] - KAJETAN VOGL ET AL., "Bacteriochlorophyll f: properties of chlorosomes containing the ''forbidden chlorophyll''.", FRONTIERS IN MICROBIOLOGY, (201208), vol. 3, page 298, XP055161840 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3389/fmicb.2012.00298 | [XP] - GREGORY S. ORF ET AL., "Spectroscopic insights into the decreased efficiency of chlorosomes containing bacteriochlorophyll f.", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (20130124), vol. 1827, pages 493 - 501, XP055161841 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbabio.2013.01.006 | by applicant | - H. TAMIAKI, COORD. CHEM. REV., (1996), vol. 148, pages 183 - 197 | - V. I. PROKHORENKO ET AL., J. PHYS. CHEM. B, (2002), vol. 106, pages 5761 - 5768 | - N. U. FRIGAARD ET AL., PHOTOSYNTH. RES., (2003), vol. 78, pages 93 - 117 | - N. U. FRIGAARD, METHODS MOL. BIOL., (2004), vol. 274, pages 325 - 340 | - S. GANAPATHY ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (2009), vol. 106, pages 8525 - 8530 | - FRIGAAD NU; BRYANT DA, APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (2001), vol. 67, pages 2538 - 2544 | - FRIGAAD NU; SAKURAGI Y; BRYANT DA, METHODS OL. BIOL., (2004), vol. 274, pages 325 - 340 | - ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (2001), vol. 67, pages 2538 - 2544 | - METHODS MOL. BIOL., (2004), vol. 274, pages 325 - 340 | - H. TAMIAKI ET AL., PHOTOSYNTH. RES., (2011), vol. 107, pages 133 - 138 |