EP2816238 - CYLINDER DEVICE WITH A FORCE MULTIPLIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/52] | CYLINDER DEVICE HAVING POWER ASSIST MECHANISM | ||
[2015/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kosmek Ltd. 2-1-5, Murotani Nishi-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2241 / JP | [2014/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARUNA, Yosuke c/o KOSMEK LTD. 2-1-5 Murotani Nishi-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2241 / JP | 02 /
YOKOTA, Hideaki c/o KOSMEK LTD. 2-1-5 Murotani Nishi-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2241 / JP | [2014/52] | Representative(s) | Dolleymores 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/52] | Knights, Rupert Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 13748942.3 | 12.02.2013 | [2016/06] | WO2013JP53219 | Priority number, date | JP20120049765 | 16.02.2012 Original published format: JP 2012049765 | [2014/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013122039 | Date: | 22.08.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2816238 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2816238 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F15B15/14, B23Q3/06 | [2014/52] | CPC: |
B23Q1/0081 (EP,KR,US);
F15B15/1409 (EP,KR,US);
F16J1/005 (KR,US);
B23Q1/009 (EP,KR,US);
B23Q3/082 (KR);
F15B15/204 (EP,KR,US);
F16J10/02 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZYLINDERVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM KRAFTVERSTÄRKER | [2015/46] | English: | CYLINDER DEVICE WITH A FORCE MULTIPLIER | [2015/46] | French: | ENSEMBLE CYLINDRE DOTÉ D'UN MULTIPLICATEUR DE FORCE | [2015/46] |
Former [2014/52] | ZYLINDERVORRICHTUNG MIT ANGETRIEBENEM HILFSMECHANISMUS | ||
Former [2014/52] | CYLINDER DEVICE HAVING POWER ASSIST MECHANISM | ||
Former [2014/52] | ENSEMBLE CYLINDRE DOTÉ D'UN MÉCANISME D'ASSISTANCE | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2014 | Translation filed | 02.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 02.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 29.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 11.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.02.2013 | AL | 10.02.2016 | AT | 10.02.2016 | BE | 10.02.2016 | CY | 10.02.2016 | CZ | 10.02.2016 | DK | 10.02.2016 | EE | 10.02.2016 | ES | 10.02.2016 | FI | 10.02.2016 | HR | 10.02.2016 | LT | 10.02.2016 | LV | 10.02.2016 | MC | 10.02.2016 | MK | 10.02.2016 | NL | 10.02.2016 | PL | 10.02.2016 | RO | 10.02.2016 | RS | 10.02.2016 | SE | 10.02.2016 | SI | 10.02.2016 | SK | 10.02.2016 | SM | 10.02.2016 | TR | 10.02.2016 | IE | 12.02.2016 | LU | 12.02.2016 | CH | 29.02.2016 | LI | 29.02.2016 | MT | 29.02.2016 | BG | 10.05.2016 | NO | 10.05.2016 | GR | 11.05.2016 | IS | 10.06.2016 | PT | 13.06.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 12.02.2013 | |
AT | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CY | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
MK | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
TR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IE | 12.02.2016 | ||
LU | 12.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
MT | 29.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 12.02.2013 | |
AT | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CY | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
MK | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
IE | 12.02.2016 | ||
LU | 12.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
MT | 29.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 12.02.2013 | |
AT | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CY | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
MK | 10.02.2016 | ||
MT | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
IE | 12.02.2016 | ||
LU | 12.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MT | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
IE | 12.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
IE | 12.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
IE | 12.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 10.02.2016 | |
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JP2008116032 (PUBOT GIKEN KK); | [A]JP2009255219 (PASCAL ENG CORP) | by applicant | JP2007268625 |