EP2815544 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR FACILITATION OF COMMUNICATIONS SESSIONS AMONGST A PLURALITY OF NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neutral Tandem Inc. d/b/a Inteliquent 550 West Adams Street Suite 900 Chicago, IL 60661 / US | [2014/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EVANS, Edward, G. 14701 Dalea Drive Oklahoma City, OK / US | 02 /
NEALE, Ian 1525 orchard LN Winnetka, IL 60093-4114 / US | 03 /
HWANG, Jack 9562 E. Maplewood Circle Greenwood Village, CO 80111 / US | [2014/52] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/52] | Davies, Simon Robert, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 13748944.9 | 14.02.2013 | WO2013US26209 | Priority number, date | US201261598581P | 14.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261598581 P | [2014/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013123245 | Date: | 22.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2815544 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/66, H04L29/02, H04L29/08, H04W76/02, // H04W8/18 | [2015/48] | CPC: |
H04L67/303 (EP,US);
H04L12/66 (US);
H04L67/141 (EP,US);
H04L67/306 (EP,US);
H04L67/565 (EP,US);
H04W76/10 (EP,US);
H04W8/18 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/52] | H04L12/66, H04L29/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/52] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERMÖGLICHUNG VON KOMMUNIKATIONSSITZUNGEN ZWISCHEN MEHREREN NETZWERKEN | [2014/52] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR FACILITATION OF COMMUNICATIONS SESSIONS AMONGST A PLURALITY OF NETWORKS | [2014/52] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR FACILITER DES SESSIONS DE COMMUNICATION PARMI UNE PLURALITÉ DE RÉSEAUX | [2014/52] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 13.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 24.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/48] | 05.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6950441 (KACZMARCZYK CASIMIR M [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11,13,14 * abstract * * figures 4-13 * * column 2, lines 3-51 * * column 5, line 45 - column 9, line 59 * * column 12, line 43 - column 13, line 24 * [I] 10,12; | [XI]EP1753198 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1,9,11-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0009] , [0011] , [0013] * * paragraphs [0023] - [0035] * * claims 1-5 * * figures 4,5 * [I] 2-8,10; | [XI]US8102988 (GAVILLET RONALD W [US], et al) [X] 1,6-9 * abstract * * figure 3 * * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 62 * * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 40 * [I] 2-5,10-14; | [XP]US2012136891 (NEALE IAN [US], et al) [XP] 1,2,6,7,9,13 * abstract * * figures 1,2,4 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0006] - [0014] ** paragraphs [0023] - [0033] * | International search | [X]US2005018659 (GALLANT JOHN K [US], et al); | [A]US2006193461 (GAVILLET RONALD W [US], et al); | [A]KR20070003740 (BIZMODELINE CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2007244987 (PEDERSEN BRADLEY J [US], et al); | [A]KR20080101561 (KT CORP [KR]) |