EP2814429 - APPARATUS FOR ENGAGING A VALVE PROSTHESIS WITH TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/52] | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR ENGAGING A VALVE PROSTHESIS WITH TISSUE | ||
[2022/19] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.03.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neovasc Tiara Inc. 2135-13700 Mayfield Pl Richmond, BC V6V 2E4 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2022/24] | For all designated states Neovasc Tiara Inc. 2135- 13700 Mayfield PI Richmond, BC V6V 2E4 / CA | ||
Former [2017/14] | For all designated states Neovasc Tiara Inc. 13562 Maycrest Way No. 5138 Richmond, BC V6V 2J7 / CA | ||
Former [2014/52] | For all designated states Neovasc Tiara Inc. 13700 Mayfield Place, Suite 2135 Richmond, BC V6V 2E4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANE, Randy, Matthew 20557 Grade Crescent Langley, British Columbia V3A 4K1 / CA | 02 /
NYULI, Colin, A. 16-784 Thurlow Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6E 1V9 / CA | 03 /
MARKO, Alexei, J. 3756 West 19th Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V6S 1C6 / CA | [2014/52] | Representative(s) | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/52] | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 13749578.4 | 13.02.2013 | WO2013CA00129 | Priority number, date | US201261598626P | 14.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261598626 P | [2014/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013120181 | Date: | 22.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2814429 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 22.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24, A61B17/94, A61F2/966 | [2014/52] | CPC: |
A61F2/2418 (EP,US);
A61F2/2403 (CN);
A61F2/2409 (CN);
A61F2/2412 (US);
A61F2/2436 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2/2475 (CN);
A61F2220/0008 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2220/0016 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0075 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/52] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM KOPPELN EINER KLAPPENPROTHESE MIT GEWEBE | [2022/19] | English: | APPARATUS FOR ENGAGING A VALVE PROSTHESIS WITH TISSUE | [2022/19] | French: | APPAREIL POUR FAIRE COOPÉRER UNE PROTHÈSE DE VALVULE AVEC UN TISSU | [2022/19] |
Former [2014/52] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM KOPPELN EINER KLAPPENPROTHESE MIT GEWEBE | ||
Former [2014/52] | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR ENGAGING A VALVE PROSTHESIS WITH TISSUE | ||
Former [2014/52] | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL POUR FAIRE COOPÉRER UNE PROTHÈSE DE VALVULE AVEC UN TISSU | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2014 | Search fee paid | 14.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 23.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009240320 (TUVAL YOSI [IL], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2011137531 (NEOVASC INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [E]WO2013072496 (INVALV LAB [FR]) [E] 1-5,9-11,14,15 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2013075215 (NEOVASC INC [CA], et al) [E] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2005283231 (HAUG ULRICH R [US], et al); | [A]US2011224785 (HACOHEN GIL [IL]); | [A]WO2011137531 (NEOVASC INC [CA], et al) | by applicant | US6629534 | US2007016286 | WO2008103722 | US2009041754 | US2009240320 | WO2009134701 | US2011015731 | WO2011137531 | WO2013072496 | WO2013075215 |