EP2809881 - LOW NOISE COMPRESSOR ROTOR FOR GEARED TURBOFAN ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Revocation of patent | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTX Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | For all designated states MTU Aero Engines AG Dachauer Strasse 665 80995 München / DE | [2023/44] |
Former [2021/12] | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | ||
For all designated states MTU Aero Engines AG Dachauer Strasse 665 80995 München / DE | |||
Former [2016/43] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | ||
For all designated states MTU Aero Engines AG Dachauer Strasse 665 80995 München / DE | |||
Former [2014/50] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation One Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | ||
For all designated states MTU Aero Engines AG Dachauer Strasse 665 80995 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOPOL, David A. 36 Lyman Road West Hartford, Connecticut 06117 / US | 02 /
MORIN, Bruce L. 20 Biella St. Springfield, Massachusetts 01104 / US | 03 /
KORTE, Detlef Waldeckstrasse 4 81543 Munich / DE | [2014/50] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/50] | Hull, James Edward Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 13749721.0 | 18.01.2013 | [2018/02] | WO2013US22035 | Priority number, date | US201261592643P | 31.01.2012 Original published format: US 201261592643 P | [2014/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013122713 | Date: | 22.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2809881 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2809881 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F01D1/02, F02C7/262, F02K3/02 | [2014/50] | CPC: |
F02C3/107 (EP,US);
F02C3/04 (CN);
F01D5/02 (US);
F02C7/06 (EP,US);
F02C7/20 (EP,US);
F02K3/06 (EP,RU,US);
F04D29/056 (EP,US);
F04D29/26 (CN);
F05D2260/4031 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RAUSCHARMER VERDICHTERROTOR FÜR DEN MOTOR EINES TURBOLÜFTERS MIT EINEM GETRIEBE | [2014/50] | English: | LOW NOISE COMPRESSOR ROTOR FOR GEARED TURBOFAN ENGINE | [2014/50] | French: | ROTOR DE COMPRESSEUR À BRUIT RÉDUIT POUR MOTEUR À DOUBLE FLUX À RÉDUCTEUR | [2014/50] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 17.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/50] | 09.03.2015 | Observations by third parties | 11.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18150616.3 / EP3327249 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.10.2018
11.10.2018
ADMISSIBLE Safran Aircraft Engines 2 boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2018/46] | 25.10.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.03.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.03.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.03.2020 | 19.03.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.03.2021 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2024/09] | 14.05.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 23.07.2021 | Appeal received No. T1210/21 | 23.07.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 24.09.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.01.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.01.2013 | AL | 10.01.2018 | CY | 10.01.2018 | CZ | 10.01.2018 | DK | 10.01.2018 | EE | 10.01.2018 | ES | 10.01.2018 | FI | 10.01.2018 | HR | 10.01.2018 | LT | 10.01.2018 | LV | 10.01.2018 | MC | 10.01.2018 | MK | 10.01.2018 | NL | 10.01.2018 | PL | 10.01.2018 | PT | 10.01.2018 | RO | 10.01.2018 | RS | 10.01.2018 | SE | 10.01.2018 | SI | 10.01.2018 | SK | 10.01.2018 | SM | 10.01.2018 | TR | 10.01.2018 | IE | 18.01.2018 | LU | 18.01.2018 | MT | 18.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | CH | 31.01.2018 | LI | 31.01.2018 | BG | 10.04.2018 | NO | 10.04.2018 | GR | 11.04.2018 | IS | 10.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 18.01.2013 | |
AL | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PT | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
TR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IE | 18.01.2018 | ||
LU | 18.01.2018 | ||
MT | 18.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
TR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IE | 18.01.2018 | ||
LU | 18.01.2018 | ||
MT | 18.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
IE | 18.01.2018 | ||
LU | 18.01.2018 | ||
MT | 18.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
IE | 18.01.2018 | ||
LU | 18.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
IE | 18.01.2018 | ||
LU | 18.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
LU | 18.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
LU | 18.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
LU | 18.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
LU | 18.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
LU | 18.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 10.01.2018 | |
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US3194487 (TYLER JOHN M, et al) [X] 10,11,15 * column 2, line 13 - line 32 * * column 4, line 35 - line 63 * * column 17, line 54 - line 67 * [A] 1,2,4,5 [I] 12-14; | [XI]US3373928 (ERWIN JOHN R, et al) [X] 10,11,15 * column 1, line 65 - line 69 * * column 2, line 20 - line 24 * * column 2, line 53 - line 67 * * column 4, line 49 - line 62; figures 1,2, * [I] 1-9,12-14; | [X]FR2260701 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 10,11,15 * column 1, line 44 - line 54 * * column 2, line 41 - line 46 *; | [X]US2009191047 (SCHLINKER ROBERT HANS [US], et al) [X] 10,11,15 * paragraph [0057]; figure 3 *; | [I]EP2157305 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [I] 1-15* paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010]; figure 1A *; | [X] - C RIEGLER ET AL, "THE GEARED TURBOFAN TECHNOLOGY - OPPORTUNITIES, CHALLENGES AND READINESS STATUS", PROCEEDINGS CEAS 2007, (20070911), XP055195802 [X] 1-3,8,9 * page 1 * * paragraph [02.1] * * paragraph [3.1.3]; figures 4,22 * | [XA] - DENÓS R ET AL, GEARED FAN, AERO-ENGINE DESIGN: FROM STATE-OF-THE-ART TURBOFANS TOWARDS INNOVATIVE ARCHITECTURES - HARDCOVER. LECTURES SERIES 2008-03,, PAGE(S) 1-26, (20080303), XP003035510 [X] 1-3,8,9 * page 16 * * page 60 - page 72; figures 4,22,62 * [A] 6,7 | International search | [A]US2850226 (LUNDQUIST WILTON G); | [A]US2957655 (KNAPP GEORGE P, et al); | [A]WO0019082 (RAMGEN POWER SYSTEMS INC [US], et al); | [Y]US2009191047 (SCHLINKER ROBERT HANS [US], et al); | [A]US2009260345 (CHAUDHRY ZAFFIR [US]); | [Y]US2010192595 (ORLANDO ROBERT JOSEPH [US], et al) | Examination | - Bruce J. Clark ET AL, "MEASURED AND PREDICTED NOISE OF THE AVCO-LYCOMING YF-102 TURBOFAN NOISE", NASA Technical Memorandum 79069, (19790314), pages 1 - 18, URL: https://ntrs.nasa.gov/archive/nasa/casi.ntrs.nasa.gov/19790007786.pdf, (20161213), XP055328531 | - Meyer Reshotko ET AL, "Core noise measurements on a YF-102 turbofan engine", NASA Technical memorandum X-73587, (19770124), URL: http://ntrs.nasa.gov/archive/nasa/casi.ntrs.nasa.gov/19770010121.pdf, (20160525), XP055275146 | other | US3194487 | US2004128978 | US2008022691 | US2009191047 | US2009301055 | US2010192595 | - RIEGLER C. ET AL, "THE GEARED TURBOFAN TECHNOLOGY-OPPORTUNITIES, CHALLENGES AND READINESS STATUS", TECHNICAL REPORT, MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH, (2007), XP003035801 | - ZALUD, "GEARS PUT A NEW SPIN ON TURBOFAN PERFORMANCE", MACHINE DESIGN.COM, (19881105), XP055129882 | - "GEARED FAN", DENÓS R; ET AL, AERO-ENGINE DESIGN: FROM STATE-OF-THE-ART TURBOFANS TOWARDS INNOVATIVE ARCHITECTURES - HARDCOVER. LECTURES SERIES 2008-03, (20080303), pages 1-26,60 - 76, XP003035510 | Opposition | US3194487 | US3373928 | US7806651 | US8246292 | - C. RIEGLER et al., "THE GEARED TURBOFAN TECHNOLOGY - OPPORTUNITIES, CHALLENGED AND READINESS", Proceedings CEAS 2007, (20070911), XP055195802 | - DENÓS R. et al, "GEARED FAN", AERO-ENGINE DESING: FROM STATE OF THE ART TURBOFANS TOWARDS INNOVATIVE ARCHITECTURES, (20080303), pages 1-26, 60 - 76, XP003035510 | - "Chapter 2", George Cramoisi, Air Cash Investigations. Accident Report NTSB/AAR-82-8, (20120000), pages 45 - 47, XP055523333 | - Dennis Culley et al, "More Intelligent Gas Turbine Engines (Des turbomoteurs plus intelligents)", RTO Technical Report TR-AVT-128, (20090400), XP055523359 | - anonymous, "Gas turbine", Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia, (20180819), pages 1 - 21, URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Gas_turbine#Jet.engines, XP055523339 | - "Turbo engine fan section", anonymous, THE AIRCRAFT GAS TURBINE ENGINE AND ITS OPERATION, United Technologies Corporation, (19880800), pages 3-6 - 3-7, XP055523347 | - "3: Compressors", anonymous, The JET ENGINE, Rolls- Royce plc, (19960000), pages 19 - 26, XP055523349 |