EP2815385 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GENERATING PANORAMIC MAPS WITH ELEMENTS OF SUBTLE MOVEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/52] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATTILA, Ville-Veikko Kokonkatu 25 FI-33560 Tampere / FI | [2014/52] | Representative(s) | Anglesea, Christine Ruth Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/52] | Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 13749804.4 | 05.02.2013 | WO2013FI50119 | Priority number, date | US201213371708 | 13.02.2012 Original published format: US201213371708 | [2014/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013121089 | Date: | 22.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2815385 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 22.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06T13/80, G06T7/20, G03B37/00, G06K9/34, H04N5/222 | [2014/52] | CPC: |
G06T13/80 (EP,US);
A63F13/52 (US);
A63F13/213 (US);
G06T13/00 (US);
G06T13/20 (US);
G06T13/40 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG PANORAMISCHER KARTEN MIT ELEMENTEN MIT SUBTILER BEWEGUNG | [2014/52] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GENERATING PANORAMIC MAPS WITH ELEMENTS OF SUBTLE MOVEMENT | [2014/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR GÉNÉRER DES CARTES PANORAMIQUES AVEC DES ÉLÉMENTS DE DÉPLACEMENT SUBTIL | [2014/52] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 01.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 18.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/06] | 28.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004036711 (ANDERSON THOMAS G [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,10-15 * abstract * * figure 3 * * figure 8 *[I] 3,6,7,9; | [XI]US2011176010 (HOUJOU YOSHIHARU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,10-15 * abstract * * figure 3 * [I] 3,6,7,9; | [XI]EP2360645 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,10-15 * abstract * * figure 1 * * figure 2 * * figures 6-8 * [I] 3,6,7,9 | International search | [A]GB189901382 (SANSON RAOUL ANDRIEN GRIMOIN [FR]); | [X]US2004125148 (PEA ROY D [US], et al); | [A]US2010182324 (KO SUNG-WOOK [KR], et al); | [X] - TOMPKIN, J. ET AL., "Towards moment imagery: automatic cinemagraphs", PROC. 2011 CONF. FOR VISUAL MEDIA PRODUCTION, WASHINGTON DC, USA, (20111116), pages 87 - 93, XP032074521 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVMP.2011.16 | by applicant | US2004036711 | US2004125148 | US2011176010 | EP2360645 | - TOMPKIN, J. ET AL., TOWARDS MOMENT IMAGERY: AUTOMATIC CINEMAGRAPHS |