EP2883072 - METHOD FOR NAVIGATION AND METHOD FOR INTEGRATING AT LEAST ONE FURTHER TRANSMITTER IN A NAVIGATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states peiker Consumer Electronics Evolution GmbH Gartenstraße 25 61352 Bad Homburg v. d. Höhe / DE | [2017/42] |
Former [2016/26] | For all designated states peiker Consumer Electronics Evolution GmbH Max-Planck-Strasse 32 61381 Friedrichsdorf / DE | ||
Former [2015/25] | For all designated states Peiker acustic GmbH & Co. KG Max-Planck-Strasse 32 61381 Friedrichsdorf/Ts / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUMGARTNER, Tobias Banzhalden str.64 70469 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
REIS, Andreas Bonhoefferstrasse 2/5 73760 Ostfildern / DE | 03 /
SCHUMACHER, Gero Hauptstrasse 25 75397 Simmozheim / DE | 04 /
SCHILLO, Christoph Köpperner Strasse 27 61381 Friedrichsdorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/25] | 01 /
BAUMGARTNER, Tobias Wilhelmstrasse 23 71034 Böblingen / DE | ||
02 /
REIS, Andreas Bonhoefferstrasse 2/5 73760 Ostfildern / DE | |||
03 /
SCHUMACHER, Gero Im Wäsemle 5 71106 Magstadt / DE | |||
04 /
SCHILLO, Christoph Köpperner Strasse 27 61381 Friedrichsdorf / DE | Representative(s) | Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Großtobeler Straße 39 88276 Berg / Ravensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/25] | Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39 88276 Ravensburg / Berg / DE | Application number, filing date | 13749979.4 | 08.08.2013 | WO2013EP02373 | Priority number, date | DE20121015794 | 10.08.2012 Original published format: DE102012015794 | [2015/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014023429 | Date: | 13.02.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2883072 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01S1/68, G01S5/02 | [2015/25] | CPC: |
G01S1/68 (EP,US);
G01S5/02521 (EP,US);
G01S5/0289 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR NAVIGATION UND VERFAHREN ZUR EINBINDUNG WENIGSTENS EINES WEITEREN SENDERS IN EIN NAVIGATIONSSYSTEM | [2015/25] | English: | METHOD FOR NAVIGATION AND METHOD FOR INTEGRATING AT LEAST ONE FURTHER TRANSMITTER IN A NAVIGATION SYSTEM | [2015/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE NAVIGATION ET PROCÉDÉ POUR INCORPORER AU MOINS UN ÉMETTEUR SUPPLÉMENTAIRE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE NAVIGATION | [2015/25] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/25] | 25.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/30] | 15.03.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.04.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]DE20114245U (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [I] 1-11 * pages 6,7; claim 1 *; | [A]US2004203904 (GWON YOUNGJUNE LEE [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0038] - [0058] *; | [A]EP2073562 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [I]EP2139261 (SONY CORP [JP]) [I] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2146219 (HTC CORP [TW]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2010109864 (HAARTSEN JACOBUS [NL], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0054] - [0066]; claim 1 * [I] 2-11; | [A]WO2012032376 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]KR20120040810 (SK TELECOM CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [E]US2013235863 (CHO CHAE HWAN [KR], et al) [E] 1-11* the whole document * | Examination | US2008280624 | US2011211563 | WO2012045347 | - TAQWAN THAMRIN ET AL, "The Inquiry and Page Procedure in Bluetooth Connection", SOFT COMPUTING AND PATTERN RECOGNITION, 2009. SOCPAR '09. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE OF, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20091204), ISBN 978-1-4244-5330-6, pages 218 - 222, XP031593782 |