EP2815763 - THERAPEUTIC AGENT FOR INFLAMMATORY DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Josai University Corporation 3-26 Kioi-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 104-0092 / JP | [2014/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, Shuji c/o Kazusa Institute for Drug Discovery 2-1-6, Kazusa-Kamatari Kisarazu-shi Chiba-ken 292-0818 / JP | 02 /
GOTO, Takeshi c/o Kazusa Institute for Drug Discovery 2-1-6, Kazusa-Kamatari Kisarazu-shi Chiba-ken 292-0818 / JP | 03 /
OHMORI, Naoya c/o Kazusa Institute for Drug Discovery 2-1-6, Kazusa-Kamatari Kisarazu-shi Chiba-ken 292-0818 / JP | 04 /
CHIANG, Kueichen c/o Kazusa Institute for Drug Discovery 2-1-6, Kazusa-Kamatari Kisarazu-shi Chiba-ken 292-0818 / JP | 05 /
SHIMADA, Yayoi c/o Kazusa Institute for Drug Discovery 2-1-6, Kazusa-Kamatari Kisarazu-shi Chiba-ken 292-0818 / JP | 06 /
INOMATA, Masafumi c/o Department of Medicine National University Corporation Oita University 1-1 Idaigaoka, Hasamamachi Yufu-shi Oita 879-5593 / JP | 07 /
KUSANO, Toru c/o Department of Medicine National University Corporation Oita University 1-1 Idaigaoka, Hasamamachi Yufu-shi Oita 879-5593 / JP | 08 /
HIRATSUKA, Takahiro c/o Department of Medicine National University Corporation Oita University 1-1 Idaigaoka, Hasamamachi Yufu-shi Oita 879-5593 / JP | 09 /
NOGUCHI, Takayuki c/o Department of Medicine National University Corporation Oita University 1-1 Idaigaoka, Hasamamachi Yufu-shi Oita 879-5593 / JP | 10 /
HAGIWARA, Satoshi c/o Department of Medicine National University Corporation Oita University 1-1 Idaigaoka, Hasamamachi Yufu-shi Oita 879-5593 / JP | [2014/52] | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [2018/24] |
Former [2014/52] | Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13751092.1 | 22.02.2013 | [2018/24] | WO2013JP54551 | Priority number, date | JP20120035965 | 22.02.2012 Original published format: JP 2012035965 | [2014/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013125687 | Date: | 29.08.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2815763 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2815763 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61P13/12, A61P29/00, A61P31/04, C07K7/06, C07K16/44, C12N5/10, C12N15/09, C07K7/08, C07K16/18, A61K39/00 | [2015/30] | CPC: |
C07K16/44 (EP,US);
C07K16/18 (US);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/14 (US);
C07K2317/21 (US);
C07K2317/24 (US);
C07K2317/34 (US);
C07K2317/55 (US);
C07K2317/56 (US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
C07K2317/622 (US);
C07K2317/76 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/52] | A61K39/395, A61P13/12, A61P29/00, A61P31/04, C07K7/06, C07K16/44, C12N5/10, C12N15/09 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEILMITTEL FÜR ENTZÜNDUNGSERKRANKUNGEN | [2014/52] | English: | THERAPEUTIC AGENT FOR INFLAMMATORY DISEASE | [2014/52] | French: | AGENT THÉRAPEUTIQUE POUR MALADIE INFLAMMATOIRE | [2014/52] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2014 | Translation filed | 18.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 18.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 18.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 13.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.11.2017 | 10.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.02.2013 | AL | 13.06.2018 | AT | 13.06.2018 | CY | 13.06.2018 | CZ | 13.06.2018 | DK | 13.06.2018 | EE | 13.06.2018 | ES | 13.06.2018 | FI | 13.06.2018 | HR | 13.06.2018 | LT | 13.06.2018 | LV | 13.06.2018 | MC | 13.06.2018 | MK | 13.06.2018 | NL | 13.06.2018 | PL | 13.06.2018 | RO | 13.06.2018 | RS | 13.06.2018 | SE | 13.06.2018 | SI | 13.06.2018 | SK | 13.06.2018 | SM | 13.06.2018 | TR | 13.06.2018 | BG | 13.09.2018 | NO | 13.09.2018 | GR | 14.09.2018 | IS | 13.10.2018 | PT | 15.10.2018 | IE | 22.02.2019 | LU | 22.02.2019 | MT | 22.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 22.02.2013 | |
AL | 13.06.2018 | ||
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
TR | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
PT | 15.10.2018 | ||
IE | 22.02.2019 | ||
LU | 22.02.2019 | ||
MT | 22.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
TR | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
PT | 15.10.2018 | ||
IE | 22.02.2019 | ||
LU | 22.02.2019 | ||
MT | 22.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
TR | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
IE | 22.02.2019 | ||
LU | 22.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
IE | 22.02.2019 | ||
LU | 22.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
IE | 22.02.2019 | ||
LU | 22.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
LU | 22.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
LU | 22.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
LU | 22.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 13.06.2018 | |
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2009117099 (ESMON CHARLES T [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract, p. 1 [0007] - [0012] in particular p. 2 left-hand column lines 3-6, p. 3 [0035] and Fig. 15A-C, p. 8 [0111]-[0121], p. 11 [0144] - p. 13 [0166], p. 14 [0190] - p. 16 [0202] and example 4 [0233] and example 5, claims 11-13 *; | [XP]WO2012023614 (JOSAI UNIVERSITY CORP [JP], et al) [XP] 1-15 * abstract, [0014] - [0018], [0020] - [0030], examples 1-6 and claims 1-22 *; | [I] - JUN XU ET AL, "Extracellular histones are major mediators of death in sepsis", NATURE MEDICINE, (20091101), vol. 15, no. 11, doi:10.1038/nm.2053, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 1318 - 1321, XP055082137 [I] 1-15 * abstract, p. 1320 right-hand column line 3 - p. 1321 left-hand column last paragraph, Fig. 3 and 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm.2053 | [A] - CATHERINE CHAPUT ET AL, "Sepsis: the dark side of histones", NATURE MEDICINE, (20091101), vol. 15, no. 11, doi:10.1038/nm1109-1245, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 1245 - 1246, XP055194652 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm1109-1245 | [A] - HAI HUANG ET AL, "Endogenous histones function as alarmins in sterile inflammatory liver injury through Toll-like receptor 9 in mice", HEPATOLOGY, (20110902), vol. 54, no. 3, doi:10.1002/hep.24501, ISSN 0270-9139, pages 999 - 1008, XP055194650 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hep.24501 | [A] - K.-C. CHIANG ET AL, "A Novel Peptide Mimotope Identified As a Potential Immunosuppressive Vaccine for Organ Transplantation", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (20090401), vol. 182, no. 7, doi:10.4049/jimmunol.0800641, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 4282 - 4288, XP055082127 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.0800641 | [A] - T. A. FUCHS ET AL, "Histones induce rapid and profound thrombocytopenia in mice", BLOOD, (20110623), vol. 118, no. 13, doi:10.1182/blood-2011-01-332676, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 3708 - 3714, XP055194648 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2011-01-332676 | [T] - TORU KUSANO ET AL, "A Novel Anti-Histone H1 Monoclonal Antibody, SSV Monoclonal Antibody, Improves Lung Injury and Survival in a Mouse Model of Lipopolysaccharide-Induced Sepsis-Like Syndrome", BIOMED RESEARCH INTERNATIONAL, (20150101), vol. 61, no. 4, doi:10.1002/eji.1830260726, ISSN 2314-6133, pages 1496 - 10, XP055194646 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2015/491649 | International search | [X]WO2006025580 (AMATERASPHARMA INC [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2011503012 (OKLAHOMA MEDICAL RESEARCH FOUNDATION); | [XP]WO2012023614 (JOSAI UNIVERSITY CORP [JP], et al); | [X] - KUEI-CHEN CHIANG, ET AL., "A Novel Peptide Mimotope Identified As a Potential Immunosuppressive Vaccine for Organ Transplantation", J.IMMUNOL., (20090401), vol. 182, pages 4282 - 4288, XP055082127 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.0800641 | [A] - JUN XU, ET AL., "Extracellular histones are major mediators of death in sepsis", NATURE MEDICINE, (2009), vol. 15, no. 11, pages 1318 - 1322, XP055082137 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm.2053 | [A] - JUN XU, ET AL., "Extracellular Histones Are Mediators of Death through TLR2 and TLR4 in Mouse Fatal Liver Injury", J.IMMUNOL., (2011), vol. 187, pages 2626 - 2631, XP055082161 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.1003930 | Examination | EP1820855 | EP2196212 | by applicant | WO2006025580 | - CRIT. CARE MED., (1992), vol. 20, pages 864 - 874 | - CHEST, (1992), vol. 101, pages 1644 - 1655 | - NATH. J. MED., (1999), vol. 55, pages 132 - 141 | - LANCET, (1998), vol. 351, pages 929 - 933 | - JAMA, (1994), vol. 271, pages 1836 - 1843 | - MORRISON, S.L.; OI, V. T., immunoglobulin genes, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1989), pages 260 - 274 | - ROGUSKA, M. L., "Humanization of murine monoclonal antibodies through variable domain resurfacing", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 969 - 973 | - TOMIZUKA, K., "Functional expression and germline transmission of a human chromosome fragment in chimaeric mice", NATURE GENET., (1997), vol. 16, pages 133 - 143 | - WINTER, G., "Making antibodies by phage display technology", ANN. REV. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 12, pages 433 - 455 | - GRIFFITHS, A. D., "Isolation of high affinity human antibodies directly from large synthetic repertoires", EMBO. J., (1994), vol. 13, pages 3245 - 3260 | - J. IMMUNOL., (1978), vol. 123, page 1548 | - CURRENT TOPICS IN MICRO-BIOLOGY AND IMMUNOLOGY, (1978), vol. 81, pages 1 - 7 | - EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1976), vol. 6, pages 511 - 519 | - CELL, (1976), vol. 8, pages 405 - 415 | - NATURE, (1978), vol. 276, pages 269 - 270 | - J. IMMUNOL. METH., (1980), vol. 35, pages 1 - 21 | - J. EXP. MED., (1978), vol. 148, pages 313 - 323 | - NATURE, (1979), vol. 277, pages 131 - 133 | - MILSTEIN, METHODS ENZYMOL., (1981), vol. 73, pages 3 - 46 | - HASEGAWA ET AL., SURG RES., (20120501), vol. 174, no. 1, pages 136 - 41 | - MURAKAMI ET AL., SHOCK, (2002), vol. 18, page 236 |