EP2817980 - AUDIO REPRODUCTION SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intertrust Technologies Corporation 920 Stewart Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [2019/24] |
Former [2015/01] | For all designated states Intertrust Technologies Corporation 920 Stewart Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAHER, David, P. 920 Stewart Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94550 / US | 02 /
BOCCON-GIBOD, Gilles 920 Stewart Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94550 / US | 03 /
MITCHELL, Steve 920 Stewart Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94550 / US | [2015/01] | Representative(s) | Williams, Michael Ian, et al Cleveland 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | [2019/24] |
Former [2015/01] | Arrowsmith, Peter Michael E. Cleveland 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 13752325.4 | 21.02.2013 | [2019/24] | WO2013US27184 | Priority number, date | US201261601529P | 21.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261601529 P | [2015/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013126603 | Date: | 29.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2817980 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2817980 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04S7/00, H04R5/027, H04R3/04, // H04R27/00, H04R29/00 | [2015/35] | CPC: |
H04R3/04 (EP,US);
H04S7/301 (US);
H04R5/02 (US);
H04S7/302 (US);
H04S7/307 (US);
H04R2205/021 (EP,US);
H04R2227/003 (EP,US);
H04R2227/005 (EP,US);
H04R2499/11 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/01] | H04S7/00, H04R5/027 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TONWIEDERGABESYSTEME UND VERFAHREN | [2015/01] | English: | AUDIO REPRODUCTION SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2015/01] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE REPRODUCTION AUDIO | [2015/01] | Entry into regional phase | 15.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 15.08.2014 | Search fee paid | 15.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.08.2014 | Examination requested [2015/01] | 29.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.02.2013 | AL | 12.06.2019 | AT | 12.06.2019 | CY | 12.06.2019 | CZ | 12.06.2019 | DK | 12.06.2019 | EE | 12.06.2019 | ES | 12.06.2019 | FI | 12.06.2019 | HR | 12.06.2019 | IT | 12.06.2019 | LT | 12.06.2019 | LV | 12.06.2019 | MC | 12.06.2019 | MK | 12.06.2019 | MT | 12.06.2019 | NL | 12.06.2019 | PL | 12.06.2019 | RO | 12.06.2019 | RS | 12.06.2019 | SE | 12.06.2019 | SI | 12.06.2019 | SK | 12.06.2019 | SM | 12.06.2019 | TR | 12.06.2019 | BG | 12.09.2019 | NO | 12.09.2019 | GR | 13.09.2019 | IS | 12.10.2019 | PT | 14.10.2019 | IE | 21.02.2020 | LU | 21.02.2020 | BE | 29.02.2020 | CH | 29.02.2020 | LI | 29.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 21.02.2013 | |
AL | 12.06.2019 | ||
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CY | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
MT | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IE | 21.02.2020 | ||
LU | 21.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IE | 21.02.2020 | ||
LU | 21.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IE | 21.02.2020 | ||
LU | 21.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
LU | 21.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
LU | 21.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
LU | 21.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 12.06.2019 | |
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 12.06.2019 | |
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5386478 (PLUNKETT BRADLEY J [US]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [XI]EP1349427 (BOSE CORP [US]) [X] 1 * figures 1, 4, 5 * * column 8, line 58 - column 9, line 6 * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] * [I] 2-10; | [I]US6760451 (CRAVEN PETER GRAHAM [GB], et al) [I] 1-10 * figures 1a,3, 4, 24, 31 * * column 3, line 47 - line 56 * * column 5, line 36 - line 40 * * column 7, line 50 - column 8, line 28 * * column 9, line 32 - line 47 * * column 10, line 65 - column 11, line 11 * * column 32, line 9 - line 15 * * column 35, line 53 - line 59 *; | [A]EP2197220 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0023] * | International search | [A]US2007086600 (BOESEN PETER V [US]); | [A]US2007263880 (SAWASHI TOKIHIKO [JP], et al); | [A]KR20100066949 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US7773755 (TERAUCHI TOSHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US7869768 (VISHLITZKY NATAN [US]); | [A]US7953456 (ROMESBURG ERIC DOUGLAS [US], et al) | Examination | - FIELDER, L. D., "Practical Limits for Room Equalization", AUDIO ENGINEERING SOCIETY 111TH CONVENTION PREPRINT, (20011101), page 1, XP008089615 |