EP2822386 - FOLATE RECEPTOR ALPHA BINDING LIGANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Purdue Research Foundation The Convergence Center 101 Foundry Drive, Suite 2500 West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | [2021/17] |
Former [2019/11] | For all designated states Purdue Research Foundation Office of Technology Commercialization 1801 Newman Road West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | ||
Former [2019/10] | For all designated states Purdue Research Foundation 1801 Newman Road West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | ||
Former [2015/03] | For all designated states Purdue Research Foundation 1281 Win Hentschel Boulevard West Lafayette, IN 47096-4182 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOW, Philip Stewart 5850 Farm Ridge Road West Lafayette, Indiana 47906 / US | 02 /
VAITILINGAM, Balasubramanian 3825 Fox Run Drive, Apt. 1344 Blue Ash, OH 45236 / US | 03 /
CHELVAM, Venkatesh 425 South River Road Apt. 35 West Lafayette, Indiana 47906 / US | [2015/37] |
Former [2015/03] | 01 /
LOW, Philip Stewart 5850 Farm Ridge Road West Lafayette, Indiana 47906 / US | ||
02 /
VAITILINGAM, Balasubramanian 204 Airport Road Apt. 13 West Lafayette, Indiana 47906 / US | |||
03 /
CHELVAM, Venkatesh 425 South River Road Apt. 35 West Lafayette, Indiana 47906 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/18] |
Former [2015/03] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13754418.5 | 28.02.2013 | [2021/18] | WO2013US28277 | Priority number, date | US201261605113P | 29.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261605113 P | [2015/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013130776 | Date: | 06.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2822386 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2822386 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/06, A61K31/475, A61K47/54, A61K47/55, A61P35/00 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
A61K38/06 (EP,US);
A61K31/475 (EP,US);
A61K47/545 (EP,US);
A61K47/551 (EP,US);
A61K49/0052 (US);
A61K51/0459 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | A01N43/54, A61K47/48, A61K31/06, A61K49/00, A61K38/06, A61K51/04, A61K31/475, A61P35/00 | ||
Former IPC [2015/03] | A01N43/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FOLATREZEPTOR-ALPHA-BINDENDE LIGANDEN | [2015/03] | English: | FOLATE RECEPTOR ALPHA BINDING LIGANDS | [2015/03] | French: | LIGANDS DE LIAISON AU RÉCEPTEUR ALPHA DE FOLATES | [2015/03] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/03] | 21.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.06.2019 | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.02.2013 | AL | 05.05.2021 | AT | 05.05.2021 | CY | 05.05.2021 | CZ | 05.05.2021 | DK | 05.05.2021 | EE | 05.05.2021 | ES | 05.05.2021 | FI | 05.05.2021 | HR | 05.05.2021 | IT | 05.05.2021 | LT | 05.05.2021 | LV | 05.05.2021 | MC | 05.05.2021 | MK | 05.05.2021 | MT | 05.05.2021 | NL | 05.05.2021 | PL | 05.05.2021 | RO | 05.05.2021 | RS | 05.05.2021 | SE | 05.05.2021 | SI | 05.05.2021 | SK | 05.05.2021 | SM | 05.05.2021 | TR | 05.05.2021 | BG | 05.08.2021 | NO | 05.08.2021 | GR | 06.08.2021 | IS | 05.09.2021 | PT | 06.09.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 28.02.2013 | |
AL | 05.05.2021 | ||
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CY | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
IT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
MK | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
TR | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 28.02.2013 | |
AL | 05.05.2021 | ||
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CY | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
IT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
MK | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 28.02.2013 | |
AL | 05.05.2021 | ||
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CY | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
IT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 28.02.2013 | |
AL | 05.05.2021 | ||
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
IT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
IT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
IT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2005080431 (MORPHOTEK INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * claims 1,8 * [Y] 1-4,6-15; | [XY]EP1900752 (DOMPE PHA R MA SPA RES & MFG [IT], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * claims 1,15 * [Y] 1-4,6-15; | [XY]WO2010033733 (ENDOCYTE INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-10,12,15 * abstract * * claims 1,16,18,20 * [Y] 1-4,6-15; | [XY]WO2010040854 (MERCK EPROVA AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-4,9-13 * abstract * * page 21; compounds VII,VIII * * page 23; compounds IX,X * * claims 12-18 * [Y] 1-4,6-15; | [XY]WO2007022493 (ENDOCYTE INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * claim - * [Y] 1-4,6-15; | [XY]WO2011069116 (ENDOCYTE INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * claim - * [Y] 1-4,6-15; | [Y]WO2010102238 (PURDUE RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,6-15 * abstract * * claim - *; | [XY] - ANGELA COLIVA ET AL, "90Y Labeling of monoclonal antibody MOv18 and preclinical validation for radioimmunotherapy of human ovarian carcinomas", CANCER IMMUNOLOGY, IMMUNOTHERAPY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20051201), vol. 54, no. 12, doi:10.1007/S00262-005-0693-2, ISSN 1432-0851, pages 1200 - 1213, XP019333088 [X] 1,2 * abstract * [Y] 1-4,6-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00262-005-0693-2 | [Y] - K. M. MAZIARZ ET AL, "Complete Mapping of Divergent Amino Acids Responsible for Differential Ligand Binding of Folate Receptors and", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19990416), vol. 274, no. 16, doi:10.1074/jbc.274.16.11086, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 11086 - 11091, XP055146926 [Y] 1-4,6-15 * page 11086, column R, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.274.16.11086 | [Y] - XIN W ET AL, "Differential stereospecificities and affinities of folate receptor isoforms for folate compounds and antifolates", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER, US, vol. 44, no. 9, doi:10.1016/0006-2952(92)90089-2, ISSN 0006-2952, (19921103), pages 1898 - 1901, (19921103), XP025567617 [Y] 1-4,6-15 * abstract * * page 1900; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-2952(92)90089-2 | [T] - B. VAITILINGAM ET AL, "A Folate Receptor- -Specific Ligand That Targets Cancer Tissue and Not Sites of Inflammation", THE JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, US, (20120612), vol. 53, no. 7, doi:10.2967/jnumed.111.099390, ISSN 0161-5505, pages 1127 - 1134, XP055226614 [T] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2967/jnumed.111.099390 | International search | [Y]WO02085908 (PURDUE RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US], et al); | [Y]WO2010033733 (ENDOCYTE INC [US], et al); | [Y]EP2258401 (ENDOCYTE INC [US]); | [Y] - BHATTACHARYA ET AL., "Folate receptor targeted, carboxymethyl chitosan functionalized iron oxide nanoparticles: a novel ultradispersed nanoconjugates for bimodal imaging", NANOSCALE, vol. 3, no. 4, (2011), pages 1653 - 1662, URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pubmed/21331392, XP055164355 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c0nr00821d | by applicant | US5627165 | - PATHALK et al., "Enzymic protecting group techniques in organic synthesis", Stereosel. Biocatal., (20000000), pages 775 - 797 |