EP2821008 - BIOINFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS AND SIGNAL PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konica Minolta, Inc. 2-7-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | [2015/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMAGURI, Kenji c/o KONICA MINOLTA, INC. 2-7-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | [2015/02] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/02] | Application number, filing date | 13755448.1 | 14.02.2013 | WO2013JP00807 | Priority number, date | JP20120040994 | 28.02.2012 Original published format: JP 2012040994 | [2015/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013128825 | Date: | 06.09.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2821008 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/024, A61B5/1455, A61B5/00 | [2015/48] | CPC: |
G01N33/49 (EP,US);
A61B5/02416 (EP,US);
A61B5/1455 (EP,US);
A61B5/7207 (EP,US);
A61B5/7239 (EP,US);
G01D18/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [2015/02] | A61B5/0245, A61B5/1455 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/02] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON BIODATEN UND SIGNALVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2015/02] | English: | BIOINFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS AND SIGNAL PROCESSING METHOD | [2015/02] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE BIOINFORMATIONS ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAL | [2015/02] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2014 | Translation filed | 26.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/02] | 18.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/07] | 24.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2020 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]WO2010073908 (KONICA MINOLTA SENSING INC [JP], et al) [ID] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] - [0026] - [0059] - [0067] - [0071] * * the whole document *; | [A]US2009312647 (KASAMA KOICHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0024] - [0027] - [0042] - [0046] - [0 50] - [0051] * * the whole document *; | [A]EP1344488 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0031] - [0038]; figure 5 * * the whole document *; | [A]US5645060 (YORKEY THOMAS J [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 6, line 54 - column 7, line 50 * * the whole document *; | [A]US6094592 (YORKEY THOMAS J [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5490505 (DIAB MOHAMED K [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2011206285 (KONICA MINOLTA SENSING INC) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2011206285 (KONICA MINOLTA SENSING INC); | [A]JP2009297184 (FUJITSU LTD) | by applicant | WO2010073908 |