EP2843046 - PRACTICAL METHOD FOR ENZYMATICALLY SYNTHESIZING CYCLIC DI-GMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMASA CORPORATION 10-1, Araoicho 2-chome Choshi-shi Chiba 288-0056 / JP | [2015/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANABE, Kaori c/o Yamasa Corporation 10-1 Araoicho 2-chome Choshi-shi Chiba 288-0056 / JP | 02 /
ISHIGE, Kazuya c/o Yamasa Corporation 10-1 Araoicho 2-chome Choshi-shi Chiba 288-0056 / JP | [2015/10] | Representative(s) | Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/30] | Harrison IP Ltd. 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | ||
Former [2015/10] | O'Neill, Michelle Harrison IP 1st Floor, Box Tree House Northminster Business Park Northfield Lane York, YO26 6QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 13755675.9 | 26.02.2013 | [2017/30] | WO2013JP55018 | Priority number, date | JP20120043688 | 29.02.2012 Original published format: JP 2012043688 | [2015/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013129427 | Date: | 06.09.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2843046 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2843046 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/09, C12N1/15, C12N1/19, C12N1/21, C12N5/10, C12N9/12, C12P19/32 | [2015/10] | CPC: |
C12N9/1241 (EP,US);
C12N15/62 (EP,US);
C12P19/36 (EP,US);
C12Y207/07065 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRAKTISCHES VERFAHREN ZUR ENZYMATISCHEN SYNTHESE VON CYCLISCHEM DI-GMP | [2015/10] | English: | PRACTICAL METHOD FOR ENZYMATICALLY SYNTHESIZING CYCLIC DI-GMP | [2015/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PRATIQUE DE SYNTHÈSE DE DI-GMP CYCLIQUE PAR VOIE ENZYMATIQUE | [2015/10] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2014 | Translation filed | 11.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 11.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 05.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.02.2013 | AL | 26.07.2017 | AT | 26.07.2017 | CY | 26.07.2017 | CZ | 26.07.2017 | DK | 26.07.2017 | EE | 26.07.2017 | ES | 26.07.2017 | FI | 26.07.2017 | HR | 26.07.2017 | IT | 26.07.2017 | LT | 26.07.2017 | LV | 26.07.2017 | MC | 26.07.2017 | MK | 26.07.2017 | NL | 26.07.2017 | PL | 26.07.2017 | PT | 26.07.2017 | RO | 26.07.2017 | RS | 26.07.2017 | SE | 26.07.2017 | SI | 26.07.2017 | SK | 26.07.2017 | SM | 26.07.2017 | TR | 26.07.2017 | BG | 26.10.2017 | NO | 26.10.2017 | GR | 27.10.2017 | IS | 26.11.2017 | IE | 26.02.2018 | LU | 26.02.2018 | MT | 26.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | CH | 28.02.2018 | LI | 28.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 26.02.2013 | |
AT | 26.07.2017 | ||
CY | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
MK | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PT | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
IE | 26.02.2018 | ||
LU | 26.02.2018 | ||
MT | 26.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 26.02.2013 | |
AT | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PT | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
IE | 26.02.2018 | ||
LU | 26.02.2018 | ||
MT | 26.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PT | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
IE | 26.02.2018 | ||
LU | 26.02.2018 | ||
MT | 26.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
IE | 26.02.2018 | ||
LU | 26.02.2018 | ||
MT | 26.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
IE | 26.02.2018 | ||
LU | 26.02.2018 | ||
MT | 26.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
IE | 26.02.2018 | ||
LU | 26.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
IE | 26.02.2018 | ||
LU | 26.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
LU | 26.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 26.07.2017 | |
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 26.07.2017 | |
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 26.07.2017 | |
NO | 26.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - VOLKER SPEHR ET AL, "Large-Scale Production of the Immunomodulator c-di-GMP from GMP and ATP by an Enzymatic Cascade", APPLIED BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY ; PART A: ENZYME ENGINEERING AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, HUMANA PRESS INC, NEW YORK, (20110628), vol. 165, no. 3 - 4, doi:10.1007/S12010-011-9294-Z, ISSN 1559-0291, pages 761 - 775, XP019973318 [X] 2-4,6-10 * abstract * * page 762, paragraph 5 - page 764, paragraph 2 * * page 767 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12010-011-9294-z | [X] - CHAO-YU YANG ET AL, "The structure and inhibition of a GGDEF diguanylate cyclase complexed with (c-di-GMP)2 at the active site", ACTA CRYSTALLOGRAPHICA, SECTION D (BIOLOGICAL CRYSTALLOGRAPHY) MUNKSGAARD INTERNATIONAL PUBLISHERS DENMARK, (201112), vol. D67, no. 12, ISSN 0907-4449, pages 997 - 1008, XP002751482 [X] 2,3,6-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1107/S090744491104039X | [X] - "SubName: Full=Diguanylate cyclase/phosphodiesterase with PAS/PAC and GAF sensor(S) {ECO:0000313|EMBL:ACV61677.1};", UniProt, (20091103), Database accession no. C8W213, URL: EBI, XP002751483 [X] 2,3,6,7,10 * sequence . * | [A] - SESHASAYEE ASWIN S N ET AL, "Comparative genomics of cyclic-di-GMP signalling in bacteria: post-translational regulation and catalytic activity", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (201010), vol. 38, no. 18, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 5970 - 5981, XP002751484 [A] 1-10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkq382 | [XP] - KOROVASHKINA A S ET AL, "Enzymatic synthesis of c-di-GMP using inclusion bodies ofThermotoga maritimafull-length diguanylate cyclase", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20121226), vol. 164, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.JBIOTEC.2012.12.006, ISSN 0168-1656, pages 276 - 280, XP028990888 [XP] 2,3,6-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jbiotec.2012.12.006 | International search | [Y]WO2010101526 (UNIV NANYANG [SG], et al); | [Y] - KAORI TANABE ET AL, "GTP Kyokyu-kei o Kyoyaku saseta Kokoritsu na cyclic di-GMP no Koso Gosei", JAPAN SOCIETY FOR BIOSCIENCE, BIOTECHNOLOGY, AND AGROCHEMISTRY 2011 NENDO TAIKAI KOEN YOSHISHU, (20110305), page 119, XP008174466 | [Y] - LUCAS S. ET AL, "GEOBACILLUS SP. Y412MC52, COMPLETE GENOME", GENBANK, (20111121), Database accession no. CP002442.1, XP055174847 | [Y] - RAO F. ET AL, "Enzymatic synthesis of c-di-GMP using a thermophilic diguanylate cyclase.", ANAL.BIOCHEM., (20090615), vol. 389, no. 2, pages 138 - 42, XP026088901 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ab.2009.03.031 | [Y] - CHRISTEN B. ET AL, "Allosteric control of cyclic di-GMP signaling.", J.BIOL.CHEM., (20061020), vol. 281, no. 42, pages 32015 - 32024, XP002527910 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/JBC.M603589200 | [XP] - KAZUYA ISHIGE, "Cyclic di-GMP Ryosanka Gijutsu no Kaihatsu", BIOSCIENCE & INDUSTRY, (20121101), vol. 70, no. 6, pages 466 - 467, XP008174493 | by applicant | WO2010066666 | WO2010101526 | WO03100056 | WO2006080313 | - ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (2009), vol. 389, pages 138 - 142 | - ABSTRACTS OF PRESENTATIONS AT THE ANNUAL MEETING OF THE JAPAN SOCIETY FOR BIOSCIENCE, BIOTECHNOLOGY, AND AGROCHEMISTRY, (2011), page 119 | - NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (20040810), vol. 32, no. 14, page E115 | - MARK ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A., (198409), vol. 81, no. 18, pages 5662 - 5666 | - ZOLLER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (19821025), vol. 10, no. 20, pages 6487 - 6500 | - WANG ET AL., SCIENCE, (19840629), vol. 224, no. 4656, pages 1431 - 1433 | - GENE, (19890415), vol. 77, no. 1, pages 51 - 9 |