EP2872043 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SENSOR INSTRUMENT, AND SENSOR INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2015/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FÖRTSCH, Stefan Harfenstrasse 19 91054 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
KUTH, Rainer Königsberger Weg 1 91315 Höchstadt / DE | [2015/21] | Application number, filing date | 13755986.0 | 19.08.2013 | WO2013EP67242 | Priority number, date | DE201210214801 | 21.08.2012 Original published format: DE102012214801 | [2015/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014029736 | Date: | 27.02.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2872043 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/1473, G01N33/487, A61B1/273 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
A61B5/1473 (EP,CN,US);
A61B1/2736 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/4233 (US);
A61B5/4238 (US);
A61B5/4255 (US);
B29C70/683 (US);
B29C70/74 (US);
B29C70/885 (US);
A61B2562/12 (US);
A61B2562/125 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2562/164 (EP,CN,US);
B29L2009/008 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SENSORINSTRUMENTS UND SENSORINSTRUMENT | [2015/21] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SENSOR INSTRUMENT, AND SENSOR INSTRUMENT | [2015/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN INSTRUMENT À CAPTEUR ET INSTRUMENT À CAPTEUR | [2015/21] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 02.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/32] | 30.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2007235331 (SIMPSON PETER C [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 2A, 2B * * paragraphs [0005] , [0061] , [0154] - [0156] - [0160] * [A] 10 [I] 2-9; | [X]US5507289 (ESSEN-MOLLER ANDERS [SE]) [X] 10 * figures 2,3 * * column 1, lines 9-21 * * column 3, line 49 * * column 5, lines 36-43 *; | [A]WO2010094651 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,3,5,6,10 * page 3, lines 17-26 * * page 5, lines 21-32 * | by applicant | DE102010006969 | - "Immediate detection of Helicobacter infection with a novel electrochenmical system", GASTROENTEROLOGY, (201005), vol. 138, no. 5, page 114 | - VON HELMUT NEUMANN; STEFAN FOERTSCH; MICHAEL VIETH; JONAS MUDTER; RAINER KUTH; MARKUS F, DIGESTIVE DISEASE WEEK 2010 |