EP2888474 - WIND TURBINE TOWER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blade Dynamics Limited Saunders Drive Cowes, Isle Of Wight PO31 8HU / GB | [2017/03] |
Former [2015/27] | For all designated states Blade Dynamics Limited Saunders Drive Cowes, Isle Of Wight PO31 8HU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYDEN, Paul 1461 Henry Clay Avenue New Orleans, Louisiana 70129 / US | 02 /
GUTIERREZ, Joaquin 147 Stafford Place New Orleans, Louisiana 70124 / US | [2015/27] | Representative(s) | Bedford, Grant Richard, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [2017/03] |
Former [2015/27] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 13756197.3 | 22.08.2013 | [2017/03] | WO2013GB52220 | Priority number, date | GB20120015004 | 23.08.2012 Original published format: GB 201215004 | [2015/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014030007 | Date: | 27.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2888474 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2888474 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F03D13/20 | [2016/44] | CPC: |
F03D13/20 (EP,US);
E04H12/02 (EP,US);
E04H12/08 (EP,US);
E04H12/085 (EP,US);
F05B2240/912 (EP,US);
F05B2250/611 (EP,US);
F05B2260/301 (EP,US);
F05B2260/96 (EP,US);
F05B2280/2006 (EP,US);
F05B2280/6003 (EP,US);
F05B2280/6013 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP);
Y02E10/728 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/27] | F03D11/04, E04H12/02, E04H12/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WINDTURBINENTURM | [2015/27] | English: | WIND TURBINE TOWER | [2015/27] | French: | TOUR ÉOLIENNE | [2015/27] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/27] | 21.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.08.2013 | AL | 18.01.2017 | AT | 18.01.2017 | CY | 18.01.2017 | CZ | 18.01.2017 | EE | 18.01.2017 | ES | 18.01.2017 | FI | 18.01.2017 | HR | 18.01.2017 | IT | 18.01.2017 | LT | 18.01.2017 | LV | 18.01.2017 | MC | 18.01.2017 | MK | 18.01.2017 | NL | 18.01.2017 | PL | 18.01.2017 | RO | 18.01.2017 | RS | 18.01.2017 | SE | 18.01.2017 | SI | 18.01.2017 | SK | 18.01.2017 | SM | 18.01.2017 | TR | 18.01.2017 | BG | 18.04.2017 | NO | 18.04.2017 | GR | 19.04.2017 | IS | 18.05.2017 | PT | 18.05.2017 | GB | 22.08.2017 | IE | 22.08.2017 | LU | 22.08.2017 | MT | 22.08.2017 | BE | 31.08.2017 | CH | 31.08.2017 | FR | 31.08.2017 | LI | 31.08.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 22.08.2013 | |
AT | 18.01.2017 | ||
CY | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MK | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
TR | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
GB | 22.08.2017 | ||
IE | 22.08.2017 | ||
LU | 22.08.2017 | ||
MT | 22.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 22.08.2013 | |
AT | 18.01.2017 | ||
CY | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MK | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
GB | 22.08.2017 | ||
IE | 22.08.2017 | ||
LU | 22.08.2017 | ||
MT | 22.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 22.08.2013 | |
AT | 18.01.2017 | ||
CY | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
GB | 22.08.2017 | ||
IE | 22.08.2017 | ||
LU | 22.08.2017 | ||
MT | 22.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 22.08.2013 | |
AT | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
GB | 22.08.2017 | ||
IE | 22.08.2017 | ||
LU | 22.08.2017 | ||
MT | 22.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
GB | 22.08.2017 | ||
IE | 22.08.2017 | ||
LU | 22.08.2017 | ||
MT | 22.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
GB | 22.08.2017 | ||
IE | 22.08.2017 | ||
LU | 22.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
GB | 22.08.2017 | ||
IE | 22.08.2017 | ||
LU | 22.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 22.08.2017 | ||
LU | 22.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2008136717 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [Y] 1-19 * page 14, line 27 - page 15, line 2; figures 1,9 *; | [Y]WO2012061710 (UNIV MAINE SYS BOARD TRUSTEES [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0059] * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US2011175365 (HINES DOUGLAS [US], et al) [Y] 6 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0017] *; | [Y]JP2006336555 (SHINKO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 11-13 * abstract * |