EP2892645 - USE OF A HOFMANN CLATHRATE TYPE MATERIAL FOR THE EXTRACTION OF MOLECULAR IODINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/29] | USE OF A HOFMANN CLATHRATE MATERIAL FOR EXTRACTING MOLECULAR IODINE | ||
[2016/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment le Ponant D 25 rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.) 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | For all designated states Université de Montpellier 2 Place Eugène Bataillon 34000 Montpellier / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/29] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment le Ponant D 25 rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (CNRS) 3 rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | |||
For all designated states Université de Montpellier 2 Place Eugène Bataillon 34000 Montpellier / FR | |||
Former [2015/29] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment le Ponant D 25 rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (CNRS) 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | |||
For all designated states Université de Montpellier 2 Place Eugène Bataillon 34000 Montpellier / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRANDJEAN, Agnès Route d'Uzès F-30330 Saint Marcel De Careiret / FR | 02 /
BARRE, Yves 784 Route de Mornas F-84100 Uchaux / FR | 03 /
TOKAREV, Alexey 101 bât B résidence Le Clos de l'olivier 8 rue du Cours Ladroit F-30200 Bagnols sur Cèze / FR | 04 /
CAUSSE, Jérémy 1213 Chemin de Loriau F-30131 Pujaut / FR | 05 /
GUARI, Yannick 151 rue des Erables F-34730 Prades Le Lez / FR | 06 /
LARIONOVA, Joulia 151 rue des Erables F-34730 Prades Le Lez / FR | 07 /
MASSASSO, Giovanni 378 Avenue du Val de Montferrand F-34090 Montpellier / FR | 08 /
LONG, Jérôme Le Domitien Bât A 23 rue Jacques Brives F-34090 Montpellier / FR | [2015/29] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/29] | Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13756482.9 | 03.09.2013 | [2016/29] | WO2013EP68196 | Priority number, date | FR20120058304 | 05.09.2012 Original published format: FR 1258304 | [2015/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014037353 | Date: | 13.03.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2892645 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2892645 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B01J20/22, B01J20/32, B01D53/68, B01D53/02, C01C3/11, C01C3/12, G21C19/42, G21F9/02, G21F9/04 | [2016/11] | CPC: |
B01J20/226 (EP);
B01D53/02 (EP);
B01D53/685 (EP);
B01J20/3204 (EP);
B01J20/3219 (EP);
B01J20/3265 (EP);
C01C3/11 (EP);
C01C3/12 (EP);
G21C19/42 (EP);
G21F9/02 (EP);
G21F9/04 (EP);
B01D2253/204 (EP);
B01D2255/20738 (EP);
B01D2255/20753 (EP);
B01D2255/705 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2015/29] | B01J20/32, B01J20/22, B01D53/02, G21F9/02, G21F9/04, C01C3/11, C01C3/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINES MATERIALS VOM TYP HOFMANN-KLATHRAT ZUR EXTRAKTION VON MOLEKULAREM IOD | [2016/11] | English: | USE OF A HOFMANN CLATHRATE TYPE MATERIAL FOR THE EXTRACTION OF MOLECULAR IODINE | [2016/11] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN MATERIAU TYPE CLATHRATE DE HOFMANN POUR L'EXTRACTION DE L'IODE MOLECULAIRE | [2016/11] |
Former [2015/29] | VERWENDUNG EINES HOFMANN-CLATHRAT-MATERIALS ZUR EXTRAKTION VON MOLEKULAREM JOD | ||
Former [2015/29] | USE OF A HOFMANN CLATHRATE MATERIAL FOR EXTRACTING MOLECULAR IODINE | ||
Former [2015/29] | UTILISATION D'UN MATERIAU TYPE CLATHRATE DE HOFMANN POUR L'EXTRACTION DE L'IODE!MOLECULAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 22.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.09.2013 | AL | 20.07.2016 | AT | 20.07.2016 | CY | 20.07.2016 | CZ | 20.07.2016 | DK | 20.07.2016 | EE | 20.07.2016 | FI | 20.07.2016 | HR | 20.07.2016 | IT | 20.07.2016 | LT | 20.07.2016 | LV | 20.07.2016 | MC | 20.07.2016 | MK | 20.07.2016 | MT | 20.07.2016 | NL | 20.07.2016 | PL | 20.07.2016 | RO | 20.07.2016 | RS | 20.07.2016 | SE | 20.07.2016 | SI | 20.07.2016 | SK | 20.07.2016 | SM | 20.07.2016 | TR | 20.07.2016 | IE | 03.09.2016 | LU | 03.09.2016 | CH | 30.09.2016 | LI | 30.09.2016 | BG | 20.10.2016 | NO | 20.10.2016 | GR | 21.10.2016 | IS | 20.11.2016 | PT | 21.11.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 03.09.2013 | |
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MK | 20.07.2016 | ||
MT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
TR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
LU | 03.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 03.09.2013 | |
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MK | 20.07.2016 | ||
MT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
LU | 03.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 03.09.2013 | |
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MK | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
LU | 03.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
LU | 03.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 20.07.2016 | |
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 20.07.2016 | |
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 20.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [YA] - GLORIA AGUSTÍ ET AL, "Oxidative Addition of Halogens on Open Metal Sites in a Microporous Spin-Crossover Coordination Polymer", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (20091023), vol. 48, no. 47, doi:10.1002/anie.200904379, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 8944 - 8947, XP055056970 [Y] 1-6,15-17 * page 8944, column right; compounds 1, 2I * * page 8946, column right, paragraph 3 * * section : "Synthesis"; page S2 * * section : "Additional information concerning X-ray studies"; page S2 * [A] 7-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.200904379 | [A] - SAIOA COBO ET AL, "Multilayer Sequential Assembly of Thin Films That Display Room-Temperature Spin Crossover with Hysteresis", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (20060726), vol. 45, no. 35, doi:10.1002/anie.200601885, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 5786 - 5789, XP055056971 [A] 1-17 * schéma 1; page 5787; figure 1 * * page S1 - page S2; figures S1, S2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.200601885 | [A] - CARLOS BARTUAL-MURGUI ET AL, "High quality nano-patterned thin films of the coordination compound {Fe(pyrazine)[Pt(CN)4]} deposited layer-by-layer", NEW JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, (20110526), vol. 35, no. 10, doi:10.1039/c1nj20212j, ISSN 1144-0546, page 2089, XP055056973 [A] 1-17 * section : "Experimental"; schéma 1; page 2090, column left * * page 2091; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c1nj20212j | [Y] - ANNA SOPKOVÁ ET AL, "The preparation of tetracyanonickelates showing electrical conductivity", JOURNAL OF INCLUSION PHENOMENA AND MOLECULAR RECOGNITION IN CHEMISTRY, (19890801), vol. 7, no. 4, doi:10.1007/BF01079775, ISSN 0923-0750, pages 401 - 412, XP055056865 [Y] 1-6,15-17 * abstract * * section : "2.1. PREPARATION"; page 402 - page 403; compound 4I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01079775 | [A] - A. T. OZA, "Oxidation of tetracyanonickellate (II) in the presence of organic cation", CRYSTAL RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGY, (198907), vol. 24, no. 7, doi:10.1002/crat.2170240715, ISSN 0232-1300, pages 711 - 716, XP055056867 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/crat.2170240715 | by applicant | - CHOI ET AL., JOURNAL OF RADIOANALYTICAL AND NUCLEAR CHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 256, no. 1, pages 19 - 26 | - RILEY ET AL., RSC ADV., (2011), vol. 1, pages 1704 - 1715 | - AMPELOGOVA ET AL., ATOMIC ENERGY, (2002), vol. 92, no. 4 | - HUANG ET AL., CHEM.COMMUN., (2012), vol. 48, pages 3227 - 3229 |