EP2893085 - METHOD OF STABILISING A SOIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/29] | A GROUND STABILISATION SYSTEM, A SUPPORT AND A METHOD OF STABILISING GROUND | ||
[2017/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GeoInnovations Limited 21 Commercial Road Swanage, Dorset BH19 1DF / GB | [2023/30] |
Former [2015/29] | For all designated states Geoinnovations Limited 21 Commercial Road Swanage, Dorset BH19 1DF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLLIS, Simon Paul 349 High Street Swanage, Dorset BH19 2NW / GB | [2023/30] |
Former [2015/29] | 01 /
COLLIS, Simon Paul 349 High Street Swanage Dorset BH19 2NW / GB | Representative(s) | Walker, Neville Daniel Alan Ipconsult 21A Commercial Road Swanage, Dorset BH19 1DF / GB | [2015/29] | Application number, filing date | 13756917.4 | 22.07.2013 | [2023/30] | WO2013GB00315 | Priority number, date | GB20120013003 | 20.07.2012 Original published format: GB 201213003 | [2015/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014013215 | Date: | 23.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2893085 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2893085 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E02D3/12 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
E02D3/12 (EP,US);
E02D27/00 (EP,US);
E02D27/32 (EP,US);
E02D27/50 (EP,US);
E02D3/02 (EP,US);
E02D5/385 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BODENSTABILISIERUNG | [2023/11] | English: | METHOD OF STABILISING A SOIL | [2023/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE STABILISATION D'UN SOL | [2023/11] |
Former [2015/29] | BODENSTABILISIERUNGSSYSTEM, TRÄGER UND VERFAHREN ZUM STABILISIEREN EINES BODENS | ||
Former [2015/29] | A GROUND STABILISATION SYSTEM, A SUPPORT AND A METHOD OF STABILISING GROUND | ||
Former [2015/29] | SYSTÈME DE STABILISATION DE SOL, SUPPORT ET PROCÉDÉ DE STABILISATION DE SOL | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 30.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2018 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 01.11.2018 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 31.01.2019 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 07.03.2019 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 28.05.2019 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 18.06.2019 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 13.11.2019 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 18.12.2019 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 02.07.2020 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 10.08.2020 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 22.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2022 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   01.09.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2023 | CZ | 26.07.2023 | DK | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | IT | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | NL | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SE | 26.07.2023 | SI | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
IT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 26.07.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5575593 (RAAF DAVID B [US]) [A] 1-25* the whole document * | Examination | NL7602974 | EP0064663 | DE3228198 | NL1017544 | CN1485505 |