EP2823403 - HYBRID STORAGE AGGREGATE BLOCK TRACKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NetApp, Inc. 495 East Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2015/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Koling 495 East Java Drive Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | 02 /
SUNDARAM, Rajesh 495 East Java Drive Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | 03 /
DOUCETTE, Douglas P. 495 East Java Drive Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | 04 /
DRONAMRAJU, Ravikanth 495 East Java Drive Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | [2015/03] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/03] | Davies, Simon Robert D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 13757686.4 | 06.03.2013 | WO2013US29278 | Priority number, date | US201213413877 | 07.03.2012 Original published format: US201213413877 | [2015/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013134345 | Date: | 12.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2823403 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/06, G06F13/14, G06F3/06, G06F12/08 | [2015/45] | CPC: |
G06F12/0871 (EP,US);
G06F12/0895 (EP,US);
G06F3/061 (EP,US);
G06F3/0656 (EP,US);
G06F3/0685 (EP,US);
G06F3/0647 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/03] | G06F12/06, G06F13/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/03] | Title | German: | VERFOLGUNG HYBRIDER SPEICHERAGGREGATBLÖCKE | [2015/03] | English: | HYBRID STORAGE AGGREGATE BLOCK TRACKING | [2015/03] | French: | SUIVI DE BLOC D'AGRÉGAT MÉMOIRE HYBRIDE | [2015/03] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2014 | Search fee paid | 07.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/03] | 29.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011066808 (FLYNN DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-4,10-12,14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0083] - paragraphs [0084] , [0098] * * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0105] * * paragraph [0206] - paragraph [0208]; figures 1-3,6-8,12,16 * [I] 5-9,13; | [A]US2007028053 (SHET UDAY D [IN], et al) [A] 2,4-11,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0022]; figures 2,4 *; | [A]US2011191522 (CONDICT MICHAEL N [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0023] , [0026] , [0031] - paragraph [0051] *; | [A]US2006156048 (HINES JEFFERY S [US], et al) [A] 5 * abstract * | International search | [A]US2012047287 (CHIU LAWRENCE Y [US], et al); | [A]US2011145489 (YU I-KANG [US], et al); | [A]US2010223429 (CHER CHEN-YONG [US], et al); | [A]US7330938 (NENOV IIIYAN N [BG], et al); | [A]WO2008070173 (FLYNN DAVID [US], et al) |