EP2823410 - ENTITY AUGMENTATION SERVICE FROM LATENT RELATIONAL DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/22] |
Former [2015/03] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GANJAM, Kris K. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
CHAKRABARTI, Kaushik c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
YAKOUT, Mohamed A. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
CHAUDHURI, Surajit c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2015/03] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2019/52] |
Former [2015/03] | Fischer, Michael Maria, et al Olswang Germany LLP IP Rosental 4 80331 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 13757813.4 | 22.02.2013 | [2019/52] | WO2013US27203 | Priority number, date | US201213413179 | 06.03.2012 Original published format: US201213413179 | [2015/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013133985 | Date: | 12.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2823410 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2823410 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/951 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
G06F16/951 (EP,US);
G06F16/2465 (EP,US);
G06F2216/03 (US)
|
Former IPC [2015/03] | G06F17/00, G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINHEITENVERSTÄRKUNGSDIENST AUS LATENTEN RELATIONALEN DATEN | [2015/03] | English: | ENTITY AUGMENTATION SERVICE FROM LATENT RELATIONAL DATA | [2015/03] | French: | SERVICE D'AUGMENTATION D'ENTITÉ À PARTIR DE DONNÉES RELATIONNELLES LATENTES | [2015/03] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 02.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/03] | 11.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.02.2013 | AL | 25.12.2019 | AT | 25.12.2019 | CY | 25.12.2019 | CZ | 25.12.2019 | DK | 25.12.2019 | EE | 25.12.2019 | ES | 25.12.2019 | FI | 25.12.2019 | HR | 25.12.2019 | IT | 25.12.2019 | LT | 25.12.2019 | LV | 25.12.2019 | MC | 25.12.2019 | MK | 25.12.2019 | MT | 25.12.2019 | NL | 25.12.2019 | PL | 25.12.2019 | RO | 25.12.2019 | RS | 25.12.2019 | SE | 25.12.2019 | SI | 25.12.2019 | SK | 25.12.2019 | SM | 25.12.2019 | TR | 25.12.2019 | IE | 22.02.2020 | LU | 22.02.2020 | BE | 29.02.2020 | CH | 29.02.2020 | LI | 29.02.2020 | BG | 25.03.2020 | NO | 25.03.2020 | GR | 26.03.2020 | IS | 25.04.2020 | PT | 20.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 22.02.2013 | |
AL | 25.12.2019 | ||
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CY | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
MT | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
TR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IE | 22.02.2020 | ||
LU | 22.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
TR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IE | 22.02.2020 | ||
LU | 22.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
IE | 22.02.2020 | ||
LU | 22.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
IE | 22.02.2020 | ||
LU | 22.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.02.2020 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.02.2020 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 25.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0229627 (POLAR EXTREME RES LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,5,8 * page 9, line 4 - page 11, line 28; figure 1 * [I] 2-4,6,7,9,10; | [A] - EGENHOFER M J ET AL, "Determining semantic similarity among entity classes from different ontologies", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON KNOWLEDGE AND DATA ENGINEERING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, (20030301), vol. 15, no. 2, doi:10.1109/TKDE.2003.1185844, ISSN 1041-4347, pages 442 - 456, XP011095940 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TKDE.2003.1185844 | [A] - RAYID GHANI, "Text Mining for Product Attribute Extraction.", ACM SIGKDD EXPLORATIONS NEWSLETTER, (20060601), vol. 8, pages 41 - 48, XP055146450 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1147234.1147241 | International search | [A]US2001042080 (ROSS GARY E [US]); | [A]US2003033288 (SHANAHAN JAMES G [US], et al); | [A]US2005216444 (RITTER GERD M [DE], et al); | [X] - JAYANT MADHAVAN ET AL., "Corpus-based Schema Matching.", 21ST INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DATA ENGINEERING, (20050405), pages 57 - 68, XP010788142 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDE.2005.39 | [A] - PETROS VENETIS ET AL., "Recovering Semantics of Tables on the Web.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE VLDB ENDOWMENT, (201106), vol. 4, no. 9, pages 528 - 538, XP055146446 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.14778/2002938.2002939 | [A] - RAYID GHANI ET AL., "Text Mining for Product Attribute Extraction.", ACM SIGKDD EXPLORATIONS NEWSLETTER, (200606), vol. 8, pages 41 - 48, XP055146450 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1147234.1147241 | by applicant | WO0229627 |