EP2823759 - PULSE MONITOR AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/03] | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Yusuke c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
KURODA, Masao c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/03] | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Yusuke c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP | ||
02 /
KURODA, Masao c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/03] | Application number, filing date | 13758178.1 | 06.03.2013 | WO2013JP01390 | Priority number, date | JP20120050139 | 07.03.2012 Original published format: JP 2012050139 | JP20120070592 | 27.03.2012 Original published format: JP 2012070592 | [2015/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013132844 | Date: | 12.09.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2823759 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0245 | [2015/03] | CPC: |
A61B5/02416 (EP,US);
A61B5/02444 (US);
A61B5/02438 (EP,US);
A61B5/11 (EP,US);
A61B5/681 (EP,US);
A61B5/6826 (EP,US);
A61B5/6843 (EP,US);
A61B5/7257 (EP,US);
G01L1/005 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/03] | Title | German: | PULSMONITOR UND PROGRAMM | [2015/03] | English: | PULSE MONITOR AND PROGRAM | [2015/03] | French: | MONITEUR D'IMPULSION ET PROGRAMME ASSOCIÉ | [2015/03] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2014 | Translation filed | 17.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 17.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/03] | 26.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/26] | 20.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.09.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US5735799 (BABA NORIMITSU [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,14,17,18 * column 1, line 6 - line 8 * * column 1, line 65 - line 67 * * column 2, line 2 - line 5 * * column 2, line 37 - line 41 * * column 4, line 15 - line 16 * * column 4, line 38 - line 45 * * column 5, line 26 - line 29 * * column 5, line 42 - column 6, line 19 * * column 6, line 23 - line 24 * * column 6, line 34 - line 49 * * figures 2, 3, 4A, 4B, 6 * [A] 15,16 [Y] 9-13 [I] 4,5; | [XD]JP2008054890 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) [XD] 1,15-18 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0030] *; | [YA]US2009312654 (KASAMA KOICHIRO [JP]) [Y] 9-13 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0127] - paragraph [0143] * [A] 4,5,15,16; | [A] - "Measure Your Heart Rate on an iPhone 4!", (20101227), URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=p6-fsyIMY14, (20150929), XP054976100 [A] 8-13 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JP2008054890 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [A]JP2009100897 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [Y]JP2009201895 (SEIKO INSTR INC); | [A]JP2010220949 (CITIZEN HOLDINGS CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2008054890 |