EP2973945 - SINGLE SEGMENT ROTOR WITH SINGLE SEGMENTS HELD BY GIRDERS AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/03] | INDIVIDUAL-SEGMENT ROTOR HAVING INDIVIDUAL SEGMENTS RETAINED BY FLEXURAL SUPPORTS | ||
[2016/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2017 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2016/03] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNEIDER, Helmut Sinnbergpromenade 14 97688 Bad Kissingen / DE | 02 /
STÄBLEIN, Armin Sonnenstr. 12 97650 Fladungen / DE | 03 /
VOLKMUTH, Benjamin Buggasse 7 97717 Sulzthal / DE | 04 /
MÜLLER, Jörg Egerlandstr. 26 97720 Nüdlingen / DE | [2016/03] | Application number, filing date | 13758778.8 | 27.08.2013 | [2016/03] | WO2013EP67656 | Priority number, date | EP20130163936 | 16.04.2013 Original published format: EP 13163936 | [2016/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014169972 | Date: | 23.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2973945 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2973945 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/27, H02K15/03 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
H02K1/2773 (EP,US);
H02K1/22 (US);
H02K1/28 (US);
H02K15/03 (EP,US);
H02K15/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINZELSEGMENTLÄUFER MIT DURCH BIEGETRÄGER GEHALTENEN EINZELSEGMENTEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2016/03] | English: | SINGLE SEGMENT ROTOR WITH SINGLE SEGMENTS HELD BY GIRDERS AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING | [2016/35] | French: | ROTOR À SEGMENTS INDIVIDUELS COMPRENANT DES SEGMENTS INDIVIDUELS MAINTENUS PAR DES SUPPORTS FLEXIBLES ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2016/35] |
Former [2016/03] | INDIVIDUAL-SEGMENT ROTOR HAVING INDIVIDUAL SEGMENTS RETAINED BY FLEXURAL SUPPORTS | ||
Former [2016/03] | INDUIT SEGMENTÉ À SEGMENTS INDIVIDUELS MAINTENUS PAR DES SUPPORTS SOLLICITÉS EN FLEXION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 22.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 19.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.08.2013 | AL | 01.02.2017 | CY | 01.02.2017 | CZ | 01.02.2017 | DK | 01.02.2017 | EE | 01.02.2017 | ES | 01.02.2017 | FI | 01.02.2017 | HR | 01.02.2017 | LT | 01.02.2017 | LV | 01.02.2017 | MC | 01.02.2017 | MK | 01.02.2017 | MT | 01.02.2017 | NL | 01.02.2017 | PL | 01.02.2017 | RO | 01.02.2017 | RS | 01.02.2017 | SE | 01.02.2017 | SI | 01.02.2017 | SK | 01.02.2017 | SM | 01.02.2017 | TR | 01.02.2017 | BG | 01.05.2017 | NO | 01.05.2017 | GR | 02.05.2017 | IS | 01.06.2017 | PT | 01.06.2017 | GB | 27.08.2017 | IE | 27.08.2017 | LU | 27.08.2017 | BE | 31.08.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 27.08.2013 | |
CY | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
MK | 01.02.2017 | ||
MT | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
TR | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
GB | 27.08.2017 | ||
IE | 27.08.2017 | ||
LU | 27.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 27.08.2013 | |
CY | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
MK | 01.02.2017 | ||
MT | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
GB | 27.08.2017 | ||
IE | 27.08.2017 | ||
LU | 27.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 27.08.2013 | |
CY | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
MT | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
GB | 27.08.2017 | ||
IE | 27.08.2017 | ||
LU | 27.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 27.08.2013 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
MT | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
GB | 27.08.2017 | ||
IE | 27.08.2017 | ||
LU | 27.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 01.02.2017 | |
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
MT | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
GB | 27.08.2017 | ||
IE | 27.08.2017 | ||
LU | 27.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 01.02.2017 | |
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
GB | 27.08.2017 | ||
IE | 27.08.2017 | ||
LU | 27.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CZ | 01.02.2017 | |
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
GB | 27.08.2017 | ||
IE | 27.08.2017 | ||
LU | 27.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | CZ | 01.02.2017 | |
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
IE | 27.08.2017 | ||
LU | 27.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | CZ | 01.02.2017 | |
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 01.02.2017 | |
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 01.02.2017 | |
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 01.02.2017 | |
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 01.02.2017 | |
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 01.02.2017 | |
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | ES | 01.02.2017 | |
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XI]DD220182 (ELEKTROMASCH FORSCH ENTW [DD]) [X] 1-3,7,11 * page 4 - page 5; figures 1-3 * [I] 8; | [XI]GB2159342 (DSO ELPROM) [X] 1,2,5-7,11 * page 1, line 39 - line 52; figures 1,2 * [I] 8; | [XI]DE68906910T (BANON LOUIS [FR]) [X] 1,9,10 * figures 2,3 * [I] 8; | [XI]US6259180 (POP STEPHEN L [US]) [X] 1-3,7,11 * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 21; figures 2,2a,3,5 * * column 7, line 59 - column 8, line 5 * * column 9, line 52 - column 10, line 6 * [I] 8; | [XI]US6703741 (IFRIM COSTIN [US]) [X] 1,2,5-7,11 * figures 3,8 * [I] 8; | [XI]US2011254399 (BLANC MAEICK [CH], et al) [X] 1,7 * figures 2,6 *[I] 8 | by applicant | EP20120159917 |