EP2891090 - INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2015/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KYUSOJIN, Hiroshi c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
YAMANE, Kenji c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
WATANABE, Hirofumi c/o Sony Digital Network Applications Inc. 2-21-28 Higashigotanda Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0022 / JP | 04 /
TAGAMI, Naoki c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2015/28] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/40] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2015/28] | DeVile, Jonathan Mark, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 13759323.2 | 20.08.2013 | [2019/40] | WO2013JP04906 | Priority number, date | JP20120187659 | 28.08.2012 Original published format: JP 2012187659 | [2015/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014034042 | Date: | 06.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2891090 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2891090 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/00 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
G16H30/20 (EP,US);
G06F3/0482 (US);
G06F3/04842 (US);
G06F3/04845 (US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/28] | G06F19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2015/28] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD | [2015/28] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2015/28] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/28] | 06.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.03.2019 | 28.03.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.11.2017 | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.08.2013 | AL | 02.10.2019 | AT | 02.10.2019 | CY | 02.10.2019 | CZ | 02.10.2019 | DK | 02.10.2019 | EE | 02.10.2019 | ES | 02.10.2019 | FI | 02.10.2019 | HR | 02.10.2019 | IT | 02.10.2019 | LT | 02.10.2019 | LV | 02.10.2019 | MC | 02.10.2019 | MK | 02.10.2019 | MT | 02.10.2019 | NL | 02.10.2019 | PL | 02.10.2019 | RO | 02.10.2019 | RS | 02.10.2019 | SE | 02.10.2019 | SI | 02.10.2019 | SK | 02.10.2019 | SM | 02.10.2019 | TR | 02.10.2019 | BG | 02.01.2020 | NO | 02.01.2020 | GR | 03.01.2020 | IS | 02.02.2020 | PT | 03.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 20.08.2013 | |
AL | 02.10.2019 | ||
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CY | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
MT | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
TR | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
TR | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 02.10.2019 | |
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 02.10.2019 | |
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 02.10.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2007097109 (SHOEMAKER GARTH B D [CA], et al) [X] 1-4,10-13,15-22,25,26 * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0095]; figure 8 * [I] 5-9,14,23,24,27; | [X]US2009208076 (NAKAJIMA TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-27 * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0080]; figures 5-7 *; | [X]US2010054556 (NOVATZKY BENJAMIN D [US], et al) [X] 1-27 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0090]; figures 3-7 *; | [X]US2011060766 (EHLKE JOSHUA TODD [US], et al) [X] 1-27 * paragraph [0151] - paragraph [0176]; figures 15-17 *; | [A]US2012011568 (TAHAN THOMAS [US]) [A] 1-27* sentence §, paragraph 63 - paragraph 64; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | JP2005176216 | JP2011244494 | JP2012187659 |