EP2888575 - STIMULATED EMISSION DEPLETION MICROSCOPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oxford University Innovation Limited Buxton Court 3 West Way Botley Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [2017/10] |
Former [2016/32] | For all designated states Oxford University Innovation Limited Buxton Court 3 West Way Botley Oxford OX2 0SZ / GB | ||
Former [2015/27] | For all designated states Isis Innovation Limited Ewert House Ewert Place Summertown, Oxford, Oxfordshire OX2 7SG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOOTH, Martin Ewert House Ewert Place Summertown, Oxfordshire OX2 7SG / GB | 02 /
BURKE, Daniel Ewert House Ewert Place Summertown, Oxfordshire OX2 7SG / GB | 03 /
BEWERSDORF, Joerg Yale University School of Medicine Department of Cell Biology 333 Cedar Street PO Box 208002 New Haven, Connecticut 06520-8002 / US | 04 /
GOULD, Travis, J. Yale University School of Medicine Department of Cell Biology 333 Cedar Street PO Box 208002 New Haven, Connecticut 06520-8002 / US | [2015/27] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2021/18] |
Former [2015/27] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 13760079.7 | 16.08.2013 | [2021/18] | WO2013GB52183 | Priority number, date | US201261692367P | 23.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261692367 P | GB20120017171 | 26.09.2012 Original published format: GB 201217171 | [2015/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014029978 | Date: | 27.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2888575 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2888575 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/63, G02B26/06, G01N21/64, G02B21/00 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
G02B21/0072 (EP,US);
G01N21/636 (EP,US);
G01N21/6456 (EP,US);
G01N21/6458 (EP,US);
G02B21/0076 (EP,US);
G02B26/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/27] | G01N21/64, G02B21/00, G06T5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STED-MIKROSKOPIE | [2020/22] | English: | STIMULATED EMISSION DEPLETION MICROSCOPY | [2015/27] | French: | MICROSCOPIE À DÉPLÉTION PAR ÉMISSION STIMULÉE | [2020/22] |
Former [2015/27] | STIMULATED-EMISSION-DEPLETION-MIKROSKOPIE | ||
Former [2015/27] | MICROSCOPIE À ÉPUISEMENT D'ÉMISSION STIMULÉ | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/27] | 15.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2019 | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.08.2013 | AL | 05.05.2021 | AT | 05.05.2021 | CY | 05.05.2021 | CZ | 05.05.2021 | DK | 05.05.2021 | EE | 05.05.2021 | ES | 05.05.2021 | FI | 05.05.2021 | HR | 05.05.2021 | IT | 05.05.2021 | LT | 05.05.2021 | LV | 05.05.2021 | MC | 05.05.2021 | MK | 05.05.2021 | MT | 05.05.2021 | NL | 05.05.2021 | PL | 05.05.2021 | RO | 05.05.2021 | RS | 05.05.2021 | SE | 05.05.2021 | SI | 05.05.2021 | SK | 05.05.2021 | SM | 05.05.2021 | BG | 05.08.2021 | NO | 05.08.2021 | GR | 06.08.2021 | IE | 16.08.2021 | LU | 16.08.2021 | BE | 31.08.2021 | CH | 31.08.2021 | LI | 31.08.2021 | IS | 05.09.2021 | PT | 06.09.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 16.08.2013 | |
AL | 05.05.2021 | ||
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CY | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
IT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
MK | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IE | 16.08.2021 | ||
LU | 16.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 16.08.2013 | |
AL | 05.05.2021 | ||
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CY | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
IT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IE | 16.08.2021 | ||
LU | 16.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 16.08.2013 | |
AL | 05.05.2021 | ||
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
IT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IE | 16.08.2021 | ||
LU | 16.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
IT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IE | 16.08.2021 | ||
LU | 16.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IE | 16.08.2021 | ||
LU | 16.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
LU | 16.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
LU | 16.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
LU | 16.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
LU | 16.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009125242 (CHOI WONSHIK [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0084]; figures 13A-14I * | [Y] - TRAVIS J. GOULD ET AL, "Total internal reflection STED microscopy", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20110704), vol. 19, no. 14, doi:10.1364/OE.19.013351, pages 13351 - 32, XP055090255 [Y] 20-23 * page 13353, line 1 - page 13356, line 16; figures 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.19.013351 | [Y] - EGIDIJUS AUKSORIUS ET AL, "Stimulated emission depletion microscopy with a supercontinuum source and fluorescence lifetime imaging", OPTICS LETTERS, (20080115), vol. 33, no. 2, doi:10.1364/OL.33.000113, ISSN 0146-9592, page 113, XP055090361 [Y] 20-23 * abstract * * page 114, column 1, line 3 - page 115, column 1, line 2; figure 1 * * page 115, column 2, line 20 - line 25 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.33.000113 | [I] - M. RUECKEL ET AL, "Adaptive wavefront correction in two-photon microscopy using coherence-gated wavefront sensing", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20061114), vol. 103, no. 46, doi:10.1073/pnas.0604791103, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 17137 - 17142, XP055090562 [I] 1-24 * page 17138, column 1, line 18 - page 17141, column 2, line 14; figures 1-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0604791103 |