EP2906631 - LIQUID BINDER COMPOSITION FOR BINDING FIBROUS MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cytec Technology Corp. 300 Delaware Avenue Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [2015/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RESTUCCIA, Carmelo, Luca 35 The Wharf New Crane Street Chester CH1 4HZ / GB | 02 /
JACOBS, William 9 Old Lantern Drive Bethel, CT 06801 / US | 03 /
HOBISCH, Gerald Reinhard Macmold Str. 39 1 A-8075 Hart Bel Graz / AT | 04 /
PONSOLLE, Dominique 1379 Conrad Drive Winona, MN 55987 / US | [2015/34] | Representative(s) | Vande Gucht, Anne, et al Solvay S.A. Intellectual Assets Management Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [2017/25] |
Former [2015/34] | Cockerton, Bruce Roger, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 13760197.7 | 29.08.2013 | [2015/34] | WO2013US57197 | Priority number, date | US201261739748P | 20.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261739748 P | [2015/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014099050 | Date: | 26.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2906631 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2906631 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08L63/00, D06M15/00 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
C08L63/00 (EP,RU,US);
D04H5/04 (US);
D06M15/55 (EP,US);
C08L81/06 (RU);
Y10T442/2738 (EP,US);
Y10T442/30 (EP,US);
Y10T442/60 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L63/00, C08L51/00, C08L101/00 (US,EP);
C08L63/00, C08L51/00, C08L81/06 (EP,US);
C08L63/00, C08L53/00, C08L101/00 (US,EP);
C08L63/00, C08L53/00, C08L81/06 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGE BINDEMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BINDUNG VON FASERIGEN MATERIALIEN | [2015/34] | English: | LIQUID BINDER COMPOSITION FOR BINDING FIBROUS MATERIALS | [2015/34] | French: | COMPOSITION DE LIANT LIQUIDE POUR LIER DES MATIÈRES FIBREUSES | [2015/34] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/34] | 24.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.05.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 17.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17164052.7 / EP3219759 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.08.2013 | AL | 21.06.2017 | CY | 21.06.2017 | CZ | 21.06.2017 | DK | 21.06.2017 | EE | 21.06.2017 | FI | 21.06.2017 | HR | 21.06.2017 | LT | 21.06.2017 | LV | 21.06.2017 | MC | 21.06.2017 | MK | 21.06.2017 | PL | 21.06.2017 | PT | 21.06.2017 | RO | 21.06.2017 | RS | 21.06.2017 | SI | 21.06.2017 | SK | 21.06.2017 | SM | 21.06.2017 | IE | 29.08.2017 | LU | 29.08.2017 | MT | 29.08.2017 | CH | 31.08.2017 | LI | 31.08.2017 | BG | 21.09.2017 | NO | 21.09.2017 | GR | 22.09.2017 | IS | 21.10.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 29.08.2013 | |
CY | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
MK | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PT | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
IE | 29.08.2017 | ||
LU | 29.08.2017 | ||
MT | 29.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 29.08.2013 | |
CY | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
MK | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
IE | 29.08.2017 | ||
LU | 29.08.2017 | ||
MT | 29.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 29.08.2013 | |
CY | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
IE | 29.08.2017 | ||
LU | 29.08.2017 | ||
MT | 29.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 29.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
IE | 29.08.2017 | ||
LU | 29.08.2017 | ||
MT | 29.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 21.06.2017 | |
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
IE | 29.08.2017 | ||
LU | 29.08.2017 | ||
MT | 29.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 21.06.2017 | |
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
IE | 29.08.2017 | ||
LU | 29.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | CZ | 21.06.2017 | |
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
IE | 29.08.2017 | ||
LU | 29.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 21.06.2017 | |
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | CZ | 21.06.2017 | |
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 21.06.2017 | |
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 21.06.2017 | |
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 21.06.2017 | |
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4448911 (HAINES RICHARD M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,13 * column 4 - column 5; example 2 * [I] 3-6,8-10,12; | [X]WO9916720 (OWENS CORNING S A NV [BE]) [X] 1 * page 7, paragraph 2 ** claim 1 * | by applicant | - D.W. VAN KREVELEN, Properties of Polymers, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHING, (1990), pages 189 - 224 |