EP2827437 - FUEL ELEMENT FOR MAGNESIUM-AIR BATTERY, MAGNESIUM-AIR BATTERY, PRODUCTION METHOD FOR FUEL ELEMENT FOR MAGNESIUM-AIR BATTERY, MAGNESIUM-AIR BATTERY SYSTEM, AND USE METHOD FOR MAGNESIUM-AIR BATTERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YTS SCIENCE PROPERTIES PTE.LTD. 10 Anson Road, 18-03 International Plaza Singapore 079903 / SG | [2015/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YABE, Takashi 2-7-2-605 Higashitabata Kita-ku Tokyo 114-0013 / JP | [2015/04] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/04] | Jones, Helen M.M. Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 13761628.0 | 01.03.2013 | WO2013JP55683 | Priority number, date | JP20120061089 | 16.03.2012 Original published format: JP 2012061089 | [2015/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013137026 | Date: | 19.09.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2827437 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01M12/06 | [2015/46] | CPC: |
H01M12/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M4/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M4/466 (KR);
H01M4/38 (US)
|
Former IPC [2015/04] | H01M12/06, H01M4/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/04] | Title | German: | BRENNELEMENT FÜR MAGNESIUM-LUFT-BATTERIE, MAGNESIUM-LUFT-BATTERIE, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR BRENNSTOFFELEMENT FÜR MAGNESIUM-LUFT-BATTERIE, MAGNESIUM-LUFT-BATTERIESYSTEM UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR MAGNESIUM-LUFT-BATTERIESYSTEM | [2015/04] | English: | FUEL ELEMENT FOR MAGNESIUM-AIR BATTERY, MAGNESIUM-AIR BATTERY, PRODUCTION METHOD FOR FUEL ELEMENT FOR MAGNESIUM-AIR BATTERY, MAGNESIUM-AIR BATTERY SYSTEM, AND USE METHOD FOR MAGNESIUM-AIR BATTERY SYSTEM | [2015/04] | French: | ELÉMENT COMBUSTIBLE POUR BATTERIE MAGNÉSIUM-AIR, BATTERIE MAGNÉSIUM-AIR, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'ÉLÉMENT COMBUSTIBLE POUR BATTERIE MAGNÉSIUM-AIR, SYSTÈME DE BATTERIE MAGNÉSIUM-AIR, ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION DE SYSTÈME DE BATTERIE MAGNÉSIUM-AIR | [2015/04] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2014 | Translation filed | 21.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2014 | Search fee paid | 21.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2014 | Examination requested [2015/04] | 06.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/11] | 19.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5958619 (CELESTE SALVATORE A [US], et al) [X] 1,5,12 * column 5, line 28 - line 48; figure 1 *; | [X]US3260620 (GRUBER BERNARD A) [X] 1,4,5,12 * column 8, line 52 - line 56; figure 4 *; | [XY]US6239508 (FARIS SADEG M [US], et al) [X] 1,5,12 * column 14, line 19 - line 27 * * column 16, line 59 - column 18, line 19 * [Y] 3; | [XDY]JP2012015013 (ELECTRA HOLDINGS CO LTD) [XD] 1,2,5,12 * paragraphs [0014] , [0015]; figure 1 * [Y] 3; | [I]US6403244 (FARIS SADEG M [US], et al) [I] 1,2,5,12 * column 20, line 45 - line 50; figure 1A * | International search | [X]US2005100781 (JANG KEVIN [US], et al); | [Y]JP2008066202 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL, et al); | [A]JP2012015013 (ELECTRA HOLDINGS CO LTD); | [A]US4916036 (CHEIKY MICHAEL C [US]); | [A]JP2003521795 (REVEO, INC.) | by applicant | JP2012015013 |