EP2867928 - II-VI BASED LIGHT EMITTING SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lumileds Holding B.V. The Base, Tower B5 unit 107 Evert van de Beekstraat 1 1118 CL Schiphol / NL | [2019/09] |
Former [2018/31] | For all designated states Lumileds Holding B.V. WTC Schiphol, Tower G4 Schiphol Boulevard 127 1118 BG Schiphol / NL | ||
Former [2015/19] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASADI, Kamal c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
DE LEEUW, Dagobert Michel c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
CILLESSEN, Johannes Franciscus Maria c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
KEUR, Wilhelmus Cornelis c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 Eindhoven 5656 AE / KZ | 05 /
VERBAKEL, Frank c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 06 /
BAESJOU, Patrick John c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 07 /
TIMMERING, Cornelis Eustatius c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2015/19] | Representative(s) | Rüber, Bernhard Jakob Lumileds Germany GmbH Intellectual Property Philipsstraße 8 52068 Aachen / DE | [2018/33] |
Former [2015/19] | van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 13762244.5 | 28.06.2013 | [2018/33] | WO2013IB55325 | Priority number, date | US201261665968P | 29.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261665968 P | US201261739165P | 19.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261739165 P | [2015/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014002069 | Date: | 03.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2867928 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2867928 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/14, C09K11/00, H01L33/28, H01L33/00, C09K11/54 | [2015/19] | CPC: |
H01L33/0087 (EP,CN,US);
C09K11/643 (EP,CN,US);
H01L33/145 (US);
H01L33/0037 (EP,CN,US);
H01L33/0095 (EP,CN,US);
H01L33/025 (US);
H01L33/16 (US);
H01L33/28 (RU,US);
H01L33/285 (EP,CN,US);
H01L33/36 (US);
H05B33/14 (EP,CN,US);
H01L2933/0016 (US);
H01L33/502 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUF II-VI BASIERENDES LICHTEMITTIERENDES HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT | [2015/19] | English: | II-VI BASED LIGHT EMITTING SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | [2015/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT À BASE DE II-VI | [2015/19] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/19] | 23.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.05.2018 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.06.2013 | AL | 15.08.2018 | AT | 15.08.2018 | CY | 15.08.2018 | CZ | 15.08.2018 | DK | 15.08.2018 | EE | 15.08.2018 | ES | 15.08.2018 | FI | 15.08.2018 | HR | 15.08.2018 | IT | 15.08.2018 | LT | 15.08.2018 | LV | 15.08.2018 | MC | 15.08.2018 | MK | 15.08.2018 | MT | 15.08.2018 | NL | 15.08.2018 | PL | 15.08.2018 | RO | 15.08.2018 | RS | 15.08.2018 | SE | 15.08.2018 | SI | 15.08.2018 | SK | 15.08.2018 | SM | 15.08.2018 | TR | 15.08.2018 | BG | 15.11.2018 | NO | 15.11.2018 | GR | 16.11.2018 | IS | 15.12.2018 | PT | 15.12.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 28.06.2013 | |
AL | 15.08.2018 | ||
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CY | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
MT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
PT | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 28.06.2013 | |
AL | 15.08.2018 | ||
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CY | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
PT | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CY | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
PT | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
PT | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 15.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4916496 (TOMOMURA YOSHITAKA [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,10,13 * figure 1 * * column 1, lines 17-24 * * page 2, lines 32-35 *; | [XY] - JUNG B O ET AL, "High-purity ultraviolet electroluminescence from n-ZnO nanowiresp <+>-Si heterostructure LEDs with i-MgO film as carrier control layer", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY 2012 ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY INC. USA, (20111216), vol. 159, no. 2, doi:10.1149/2.029202JES, pages H102 - H106, XP002718062 [X] 1-3,6,7,10,12,13 * figures 1a,3b * * page H102, column 2, line 9 * * figure 4 * [Y] 11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/2.029202JES | [YA] - JONG-GUL YOON ET AL, "Electroluminescence from n-n Isotype Heterostructures of Graded-band-gap ZnMgO : Al and ZnO Films on Platinized Si", JOURNAL OF PHYSICS D: APPLIED PHYSICS IOP PUBLISHING LTD. UK, (20111019), vol. 44, no. 41, ISSN 0022-3727, XP002718063 [Y] 11 * figure 4 * * page 2, column 1, paragraph 2 * [A] 8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0022-3727/44/41/415402 | by applicant | US4278913 |