EP2895453 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING DIMETHYL ETHER AND DEVICE SUITABLE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states thyssenkrupp Industrial Solutions AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | [2018/35] |
Former [2017/52] | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Industrial Solutions AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2015/30] | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Uhde GmbH Friedrich-Uhde-Strasse 15 44141 Dortmund / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUER, Melanie Küntzelstraße 43 45147 Essen / DE | 02 /
KÖMPEL, Harald Kreisstrasse 68a 61118 Bad Vilbel / DE | 03 /
SCHULZ, Alexander Hammarskjöldring 75G 60439 Frankfurt / DE | [2018/26] |
Former [2015/30] | 01 /
BAUER, Melanie Küntzelstraße 43 45147 Essen / DE | ||
02 /
KÖMPEL, Harald Nachtigallenstraße 44 63263 Neu-Isenburg / DE | |||
03 /
SCHULZ, Alexander Hammarskjöldring 75G 60439 Frankfurt / DE | Representative(s) | thyssenkrupp Intellectual Property GmbH ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | [2018/45] |
Former [2015/30] | ThyssenKrupp AG - IP Services CF-TIS/IPS ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 13762988.7 | 10.09.2013 | [2018/45] | WO2013EP02702 | Priority number, date | DE20121018341 | 15.09.2012 Original published format: DE102012018341 | [2015/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014040719 | Date: | 20.03.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2895453 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2895453 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07C41/09, B01J19/00, C07C43/04 | [2018/17] | CPC: |
C07C41/09 (EP,US);
B01D3/002 (EP,US);
B01D3/009 (EP,US);
B01D3/143 (US);
B01J19/245 (US);
B01J8/0457 (EP,US);
C07C41/42 (US);
B01J2208/00256 (US);
B01J2208/065 (US);
B01J2219/00006 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00103 (US);
B01J2219/24 (US);
Y02P20/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C41/09, C07C43/043 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/30] | C07C41/09, B01J19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DIMETHYLETHER UND DAFÜR GEEIGNETE VORRICHTUNG | [2015/30] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING DIMETHYL ETHER AND DEVICE SUITABLE THEREFOR | [2015/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'ÉTHER DIMÉTHYLIQUE ET DISPOSITIF APPROPRIÉ AU PROCÉDÉ | [2015/30] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/30] | 13.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.09.2013 | AL | 07.11.2018 | CY | 07.11.2018 | CZ | 07.11.2018 | EE | 07.11.2018 | ES | 07.11.2018 | FI | 07.11.2018 | HR | 07.11.2018 | LT | 07.11.2018 | LV | 07.11.2018 | MC | 07.11.2018 | MK | 07.11.2018 | MT | 07.11.2018 | NL | 07.11.2018 | PL | 07.11.2018 | RO | 07.11.2018 | RS | 07.11.2018 | SE | 07.11.2018 | SI | 07.11.2018 | SK | 07.11.2018 | SM | 07.11.2018 | TR | 07.11.2018 | BG | 07.02.2019 | NO | 07.02.2019 | GR | 08.02.2019 | IS | 07.03.2019 | PT | 07.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 10.09.2013 | |
AL | 07.11.2018 | ||
CY | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
MT | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 10.09.2013 | |
AL | 07.11.2018 | ||
CY | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CY | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | ES | 07.11.2018 | |
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | ES | 07.11.2018 | |
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | ES | 07.11.2018 | |
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 07.11.2018 | |
NO | 07.02.2019 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2006041253 (SK CORP [KR], et al) [AD] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [XI]CN101903323 (JGC CORP, et al) [X] 1,2,4-13,16-21 * the whole document * [I] 3,14,15; | [ADP]WO2013041516 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR], et al) [ADP] 1-21* the whole document * | Examination | DE102011114228 | WO2013041516 |