EP2892915 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS COMPRISING MALE FERTILITY SEQUENCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.10.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. 7100 N.W. 62nd Avenue Johnson, IA 50131-1014 / US | [2015/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALBERTSEN, Marc c/o Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. 7250 N.W. 62nd Avenue Johnston, Iowa 50131-0552 / US | 02 /
CIGAN, Andrew Mark c/o Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. 7250 N.W. 62nd Avenue Johnston, Iowa 50131-0552 / US | 03 /
HERSHEY, Howard c/o Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. 7250 N.W. 62nd Avenue Johnston, Iowa 50131-0552 / US | 04 /
LASSNER, Mike c/o Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. 7250 N.W. 62nd Avenue Johnston, Iowa 50131-0552 / US | 05 /
WU, Yongzhong c/o Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. 7250 N.W. 62nd Avenue Johnston, Iowa 50131-0552 / US | [2015/29] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/29] | Bentham, Andrew J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13763163.6 | 06.09.2013 | WO2013US58500 | Priority number, date | US201261697590P | 06.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261697590 P | [2015/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014039815 | Date: | 13.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2892915 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/415, C12N15/82 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
C12N15/8289 (EP,US);
C07K14/415 (EP,CN,US);
A01H5/10 (US);
A01H6/4678 (US);
C12N15/82 (US);
C12N15/8287 (CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN MIT MÄNNLICHEN FERTILITÄTSSEQUENZEN | [2015/29] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS COMPRISING MALE FERTILITY SEQUENCES | [2015/29] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS COMPRENANT DES SÉQUENCES DE FERTILITÉ MÂLE | [2015/29] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 04.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.10.2018 | 08.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/08] | 12.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.10.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.05.2016 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.02.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 10.02.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.02.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO0206499 (PIONEER HI BRED INT [US], et al); | [XY]US2006015968 (ALBERTSEN MARC C [US], et al); | [X]US2006288440 (ALBERTSEN MARC C [US], et al); | [X]US2007044171 (KOVALIC DAVID K [US], et al); | [X]US2007214517 (ALEXANDROV NICKOLAI [US], et al); | [X]WO2009020458 (PIONEER HI BRED INT [US], et al); | Examination | WO2013066423 |