EP2827697 - SPIKER ROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tru-Turf Pty Ltd 6/8 Technology Drive Arundel, Qld 4214 / AU | [2015/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUFTY, Raymond Jeffrey 6/8 Technology Drive Arundel Qld 4214 / AU | [2015/05] | Representative(s) | Cummings, Sean Patrick Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/47] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al Hepworth Browne 15 St Paul's Street Leeds LS1 2JG / GB | ||
Former [2015/05] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al Hepworth Browne Pearl Chambers 22 East Parade Leeds LS1 5BY / GB | Application number, filing date | 13763777.3 | 18.03.2013 | [2019/47] | WO2013AU00270 | Priority number, date | AU20120901105 | 19.03.2012 Original published format: AU 2012901105 | [2015/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013138848 | Date: | 26.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2827697 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2827697 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 26.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A01B29/04, A01B45/02, A01B1/24 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
A01B29/04 (EP,US);
A01B45/02 (US)
|
Former IPC [2015/05] | A01B45/02, A01B1/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZINKENWALZE | [2015/05] | English: | SPIKER ROLLER | [2015/05] | French: | ROULEAU À POINTES | [2019/24] |
Former [2015/05] | ROULEAU À CRAMPONS | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2014 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 15.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/05] | 14.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.11.2018 | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.03.2013 | AL | 20.11.2019 | CY | 20.11.2019 | CZ | 20.11.2019 | EE | 20.11.2019 | FI | 20.11.2019 | HR | 20.11.2019 | IT | 20.11.2019 | LT | 20.11.2019 | LV | 20.11.2019 | MC | 20.11.2019 | MK | 20.11.2019 | MT | 20.11.2019 | PL | 20.11.2019 | RO | 20.11.2019 | RS | 20.11.2019 | SI | 20.11.2019 | SK | 20.11.2019 | SM | 20.11.2019 | TR | 20.11.2019 | BG | 20.02.2020 | NO | 20.02.2020 | GR | 21.02.2020 | LU | 18.03.2020 | IS | 20.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | CH | 31.03.2020 | LI | 31.03.2020 | PT | 12.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 18.03.2013 | |
AL | 20.11.2019 | ||
CY | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
MT | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
TR | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
LU | 18.03.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
TR | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
LU | 18.03.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
LU | 18.03.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
LU | 18.03.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
LU | 18.03.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 20.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2006006159 (IC STOCK JAPAN INC) [A] 1-8* the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5101910 (DAWSON TIMOTHY D [US]); | [X]JP2006006159 (IC STOCK JAPAN INC); | [A] - "Sarel Spikes", SAREL SPIKES, (20130603), URL: http://www.pitchcare.com/shop/aerators/sarel-spiking-roller-accessories.html, XP055161340 | [A] - 'SAREL SPIKES', "GOLF NETS & COURSE EQUIPMENT,DIRECT FROM YOUR MANUFACTURER & SUPPLIER", HUCK GOLF, (20100909), URL: http://pdfs.findtheneedle.co.uk/117848-4267.pdf, (20130603), XP055176514 | by applicant | GB127808 | US1965510 | GB605974 | JP2006006159 | US2006180324 |