EP2959395 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PUBLICATION AND SHARING OF FILES VIA THE INTERNET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fast Track Technologies Limited 5/F Anderson Square Limited Shedden Road Grand Cayman KY1-1103 / KY | For all designated states Wilson, Brett, J. 2 Mayfield Court Montrose, Victoria 3765 / AU | [2016/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILSON, Brett, J. 2 Mayfield Court Montrose, Victoria 3765 / AU | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | Schmid, Wolfgang Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2016/01] | Application number, filing date | 13764088.4 | 21.05.2013 | [2016/01] | WO2013IB00939 | Priority number, date | deleted | [2016/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013140256 | Date: | 26.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2959395 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, G06F9/44 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
G06F16/972 (EP,US);
G06F16/955 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERÖFFENTLICHUNG UND GEMEINSAMEN NUTZUNG VON DATEIEN ÜBER DAS INTERNET | [2016/01] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PUBLICATION AND SHARING OF FILES VIA THE INTERNET | [2016/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE PUBLICATION ET DE PARTAGE DE FICHIERS PAR L'INTERMÉDIAIRE D'INTERNET | [2016/01] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 18.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/53] | 21.10.2014 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 22.01.2015 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001 | 01.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/20] | 11.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/20] | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 16.12.2014 | Date of receipt | 03.12.2015 | Request rejected | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2010177696 (JUNG JIN-HE [KR], et al); | [X]US2011137986 (WOLF EDWARD O'BRIEN [US]); | [A]US2009012964 (AHN KI-SOON [KR]); | [A]US2008301233 (CHOI SUNG-WONE [KR]); | [A]US8099463 (HOROWITZ STEVEN [US], et al) |