EP2829245 - SURGICAL GRIPPING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [2015/44] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2015/05] | For all designated states Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASUDA, Shinya c/o Intellectual Property Support Department OLYMPUS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY SERVICES CO. LTD. 2-3 Kuboyama-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8512 / JP | 02 /
ONUMA, Ryu c/o Intellectual Property Support Department OLYMPUS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY SERVICES CO. LTD. 2-3 Kuboyama-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8512 / JP | 03 /
KAGA, Tomoyuki c/o Intellectual Property Support Department OLYMPUS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY SERVICES CO. LTD. 2-3 Kuboyama-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8512 / JP | 04 /
INAGAKI, Genri c/o Intellectual Property Support Department OLYMPUS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY SERVICES CO. LTD. 2-3 Kuboyama-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8512 / JP | [2015/05] | Representative(s) | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/05] | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13764334.2 | 18.03.2013 | WO2013JP57712 | Priority number, date | US201261612632P | 19.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261612632 P | [2015/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013141217 | Date: | 26.09.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2829245 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14, A61B17/32, A61B17/29, // A61B18/00, A61B17/00, A61B17/28 | [2019/24] | CPC: |
A61B18/1445 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00367 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2825 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2929 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2946 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320093 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/47] | A61B18/12, A61B18/00, A61B17/32 | ||
Former IPC [2015/05] | A61B18/12, A61B18/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/05] | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHE GREIFVORRICHTUNG | [2015/05] | English: | SURGICAL GRIPPING DEVICE | [2015/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF CHIRURGICAL DE SAISIE | [2015/05] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2014 | Translation filed | 08.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2014 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/05] | 11.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/15] | 19.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDA]US2009270853 (YACHI CHIE [JP], et al) [XD] 1-3 * paragraphs [0086] , [0148] - [0151] - [0166] - [0168] - [0172]; figures 1-40 * [A] 4-15; | [XA]US2011004127 (OKADA MITSUMASA [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0230] - paragraph [0240]; figures 1-87 * * paragraph [0312] - paragraph [0316] * * paragraphs [0359] , [0443] , [0444] , [0492] , [0493] * [A] 2-15; | [A]EP2263586 (COVIDIEN AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0030] , [0087]; figures 1-32 *; | [A]US2007043352 (GARRISON DAVID M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0067] , [0075] , [0103] , [0104]; figures 1-33 *; | [A]US6569178 (MIYAWAKI MAKOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 13, line 61 - column 14, line 8; figures 1-49 * * column 17, line 60 - column 18, line 8 * | International search | [A]WO2011099571 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JP2000254135 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) | by applicant | US2009270853 | US2009088668 | US2008132887 |