EP2829620 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING HEMATITE FOR IRON-MAKING USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Metal Mining Co., Ltd. 11-3, Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8716 / JP | [2015/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OZAKI Yoshitomo c/o Niihama Research Laboratories Sumitomo Metal Mining Co. Ltd. 17-5 Isoura-cho Niihama-shi Ehime 792-0002 / JP | 02 /
ENOMOTO Manabu c/o Niihama Research Laboratories Sumitomo Metal Mining Co. Ltd. 17-5 Isoura-cho Niihama-shi Ehime 792-0002 / JP | 03 /
SHOUJI Hirofumi c/o Niihama Research Laboratories Sumitomo Metal Mining Co. Ltd. 17-5 Isoura-cho Niihama-shi Ehime 792-0002 / JP | 04 /
HIGAKI Tatsuya c/o Niihama Research Laboratories Sumitomo Metal Mining Co. Ltd. 17-5 Isoura-cho Niihama-shi Ehime 792-0002 / JP | [2015/05] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/05] | Tranter, Andrew David Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13764654.3 | 13.02.2013 | WO2013JP53411 | Priority number, date | JP20120063596 | 21.03.2012 Original published format: JP 2012063596 | [2015/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013140900 | Date: | 26.09.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2829620 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C22B3/04, B09B3/00, C22B23/00 | [2015/05] | CPC: |
B09B3/00 (EP,US);
C01G49/06 (US);
B09B3/40 (EP,US);
C22B23/0415 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/05] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HÄMATIT ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER HERSTELLUNG VON EISEN | [2015/05] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING HEMATITE FOR IRON-MAKING USE | [2015/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'HÉMATITE POUR UNE UTILISATION DANS LA FABRICATION DU FER | [2015/05] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2014 | Translation filed | 16.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2014 | Search fee paid | 16.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/05] | 09.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/33] | 14.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.08.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2021 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3761566 (MICHAL E) [A] 1-3 * figure -; example -; claim - *; | [XAY]US4435369 (SIMPSON CHARLES H [US]) [X] 2 * column 1, lines 33-50; figure 1; example -; claim - * * column 2, lines 36-51 * * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 68 * [A] 1 [Y] 3; | [X]US2006024224 (NEUDORF DAVID [CA], et al) [X] 2 * paragraphs [0029] - [0034] - [0038] - [0040] - [0051] * * paragraphs [0002] , [0016] , [0021] , [0029] , [0055] - [0061]; figure 1; claim - * * paragraph [0046]; example - *; | [A]US2007297960 (KREBS DAMIEN G I [AU]) [A] 1-3* figure - *; | [XAY]AU2009200714 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO) [X] 1 * pages 4,8; examples 1,2; claim - * * pages 14-18 * [A] 2 [Y] 3; | [Y]US2010034716 (NAKAI OSAMU [JP], et al) [Y] 3 * figure -; example 1; claim - *; | [X]CN102345018 (BEIJING GEN RES INST MINING) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0016] - [0034] - [0037]; example -; claim - * | International search | [A]WO2007053919 (VALE DO RIO DOCE CO [BR], et al); | [A]WO2007095689 (MURRIN MURRIN OPERATIONS PTY [AU], et al); | [A]JP2010095788 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO) | by applicant | JPH03176081 |