EP2830370 - MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, WIRELESS BASE STATION, AND MOBILE COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyocera Corporation 6, Takedatobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2015/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJISHIRO, Masato c/o KYOCERA Corporation Head Office 6 Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-Ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2015/05] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/05] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13765201.2 | 15.03.2013 | WO2013JP57362 | Priority number, date | US201261612546P | 19.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261612546 P | [2015/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013141148 | Date: | 26.09.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2830370 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W56/00, H04W28/16, H04W36/08, H04W92/20 | [2015/05] | CPC: |
H04W56/001 (EP,US);
H04W56/0015 (US);
H04W36/0066 (US);
H04W36/08 (EP,US);
H04W92/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/05] | Title | German: | MOBILES KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, DRAHTLOSE BASISSTATION UND MOBILES KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2015/05] | English: | MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, WIRELESS BASE STATION, AND MOBILE COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2015/05] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE, STATION DE BASE SANS FIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE | [2015/05] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2014 | Translation filed | 25.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 25.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/05] | 28.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008133567 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [X]WO2011137561 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) | International search | [Y]JP2000333234 (CIT ALCATEL); | [Y]JP2010004247 (KYOCERA CORP); | [X]WO2010118261 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al); | [Y]JP2010252355 (QUALCOMM INC); | [X]JP2011087126 (KYOCERA CORP); |