EP2892488 - LOW-AIR-LOSS (LAL) PATIENT SUPPORT APPARATUSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/29] | LOW-AIR-LOSS (LAL) PATIENT SUPPORT APPARATUSES AND METHODS | ||
[2018/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huntleigh Technology Limited Arjohuntleigh House Houghton Hall Business Park Houghton Regis Dunstable, Bedfordshire LU5 5XF / GB | [2018/30] |
Former [2015/29] | For all designated states Huntleigh Technology Limited Arjohuntleigh House Houghton Hall Business Park Houghton Regis Dunstable, Bedfordshire LU5 5XF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VRZALIK, John, H. 4444 Lane Drive San Antonio, TX 78263 / US | 02 /
PHILLIPS, Bruce 4610 La Bahia Way San Antonio, TX 78253 / US | 03 /
HONG, K.Z. 114 Talavera Parkway Apt 1521 San Antonio, TX 78232 / US | [2015/29] | Representative(s) | Ström & Gulliksson AB P O Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/30] | Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 2013 13 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2015/29] | Thaker, Shalini Huntleigh Technology Limited ArjoHuntleigh House Houghton Hall Business Park Houghton Regis, Beds LU5 5XF / GB | Application number, filing date | 13765577.5 | 06.09.2013 | [2018/30] | WO2013US58516 | Priority number, date | US201261698039P | 07.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261698039 P | [2015/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014039827 | Date: | 13.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2892488 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2892488 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/057 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
A61G7/05769 (EP,US);
A47C27/006 (US);
A47C27/081 (US);
A47C27/10 (US);
A61G7/015 (US);
A61G7/05784 (EP,US);
A61G7/05792 (EP,US);
B32B37/00 (US);
B32B2307/7265 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PATIENTENLIEGEVORRICHTUNGEN MIT GERINGEM LUFTVERLUST | [2018/12] | English: | LOW-AIR-LOSS (LAL) PATIENT SUPPORT APPARATUSES | [2018/12] | French: | APPAREILS DE SUPPORT DE PATIENT À FAIBLE PERTE D'AIR (LAL) | [2018/12] |
Former [2015/29] | PATIENTENLIEGEVORRICHTUNGEN MIT GERINGEM LUFTVERLUST UND VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2015/29] | LOW-AIR-LOSS (LAL) PATIENT SUPPORT APPARATUSES AND METHODS | ||
Former [2015/29] | APPAREILS ET PROCÉDÉS DE SUPPORT DE PATIENT À FAIBLE PERTE D'AIR (LAL) | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 04.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.09.2013 | AL | 25.07.2018 | CY | 25.07.2018 | DK | 25.07.2018 | EE | 25.07.2018 | FI | 25.07.2018 | HR | 25.07.2018 | LT | 25.07.2018 | LV | 25.07.2018 | MC | 25.07.2018 | MK | 25.07.2018 | PT | 25.07.2018 | RO | 25.07.2018 | RS | 25.07.2018 | SI | 25.07.2018 | SK | 25.07.2018 | SM | 25.07.2018 | TR | 25.07.2018 | IE | 06.09.2018 | LU | 06.09.2018 | MT | 06.09.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | CH | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | BG | 25.10.2018 | NO | 25.10.2018 | GR | 26.10.2018 | IS | 25.11.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 06.09.2013 | |
AL | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PT | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
MT | 06.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PT | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
MT | 06.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
MT | 06.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
MT | 06.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 25.07.2018 | |
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 25.07.2018 | |
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 25.07.2018 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5509155 (ZIGARAC KEVIN [US], et al) [Y] 4-8,23-27 * column 5, lines 14-24; figure 1 *; | [A]US2001020303 (ENDO TATSUO [JP], et al) [A] 10-15 * paragraph [0038]; figure 4 *; | [A]US2007261548 (VRZALIK JOHN H [US], et al) [A] 1,20 * paragraphs [0045] - [0047] - [0 58] - [0062]; figure 5 *; | [XYI]WO2008014277 (KCI LICENSING INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9,16-18,20-22,28,30-34 * figures 2,3,9 * * page 8, line 16 - page 9, line 30 * * page 11, lines 5-24 * [Y] 4-8,23-27 [I] 10-15,19,29; | [A]US2008084095 (WOLAS SCOTT R [US]) [A] 1,20* paragraphs [0024] - [0027] - [0029]; figure 5 * |