EP2895510 - SINGLE DOMAIN ANTIBODY WITH C-TERMINAL MODIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2015/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOEW, Andreas Novartis Institutes for BioMedical Research Inc. 250 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge Massachusetts 02139 / US | 02 /
EBERSBACH, Hilmar Novartis Pharma AG Postfach CH-4002 Basel / CH | [2015/30] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2015/30] | Application number, filing date | 13766855.4 | 13.09.2013 | WO2013US59721 | Priority number, date | US201261700529P | 13.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261700529 P | US201361789856P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361789856 P | [2015/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014043509 | Date: | 20.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2895510 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/00, C07K16/18, A61P43/00 | [2015/30] | CPC: |
C07K16/00 (EP,US);
G01N33/5306 (US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/30] | Title | German: | EINZELDOMÄNENANTIKÖRPER MIT C-TERMINALER-MODIFIKATION | [2017/46] | English: | SINGLE DOMAIN ANTIBODY WITH C-TERMINAL MODIFICATION | [2015/30] | French: | ANTICORPS A DOMAINE UNIQUE AVEC MODIFICATION C-TERMINALE | [2017/45] |
Former [2015/30] | EINZELDOMÄNENANTIKÖRPER MIT C-TERMINAL-MODIFIKATION | ||
Former [2015/30] | MOLÉCULE DE LIAISON À UN ANTIGÈNE À MODIFICATIONS TERMINALES | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/30] | 27.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/36] | 11.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/36] | Divisional application(s) | EP18159741.0 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2016 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 05.06.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 05.06.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.06.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004041863 (ABLYNX NV [BE], et al) [X] 1-3,19,25,26 * page 49, line 1 - line 2 *; | [I]WO2011073954 (SANOFI AVENTIS [FR], et al) [I] 1-28 * page 4, lines 20-24 * * page 17, line 30 - page 20, line 6 * * claims 7,14,15 *; | [XP]WO2012175741 (ABLYNX NV [BE], et al) [XP] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO2013024059 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [XP] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [AP] - M. C. HOLLAND ET AL, "Autoantibodies to Variable Heavy (VH) Chain Ig Sequences in Humans Impact the Safety and Clinical Pharmacology of a VH Domain Antibody Antagonist of TNF-[alpha] Receptor 1", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, (20130706), vol. 33, no. 7, doi:10.1007/s10875-013-9915-0, ISSN 0271-9142, pages 1192 - 1203, XP055111245 [AP] 1-28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10875-013-9915-0 | [A] - FIONA A HARDING, "Eur J Immunol. 1983 Jul;13(7):533-40.", MABS, (20100601), vol. 2, no. 3, pages 256 - 265, XP055040346 [A] 1-28 * the whole document * |