EP2893350 - RESISTANCE BIOMARKERS FOR HDAC INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celgene Corporation 86 Morris Avenue Summit, NJ 07901 / US | [2015/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TROWE, Torsten, Bernhard 117 Tiffany Avenue San Francisco, CA 94110 / US | [2015/29] | Representative(s) | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2015/29] | Application number, filing date | 13767166.5 | 06.09.2013 | [2016/35] | WO2013US58379 | Priority number, date | US201261698341P | 07.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261698341 P | US201261726464P | 14.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261726464 P | US201361784501P | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361784501 P | [2015/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014039744 | Date: | 13.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2893350 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2893350 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/574, A61K38/15, G01N33/68 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
G01N33/574 (EP,CN,US);
A61K38/12 (US);
A61K38/15 (US);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
G01N33/6893 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/29] | G01N33/574 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RESISTENZBIOMARKER FÜR HDAC-HEMMER | [2015/29] | English: | RESISTANCE BIOMARKERS FOR HDAC INHIBITORS | [2015/29] | French: | BIOMARQUEURS DE RÉSISTANCE AUX INHIBITEURS DE HDAC | [2015/29] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 15.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.09.2013 | AL | 31.08.2016 | AT | 31.08.2016 | BE | 31.08.2016 | CY | 31.08.2016 | CZ | 31.08.2016 | DK | 31.08.2016 | EE | 31.08.2016 | ES | 31.08.2016 | FI | 31.08.2016 | HR | 31.08.2016 | IS | 31.08.2016 | IT | 31.08.2016 | LT | 31.08.2016 | LV | 31.08.2016 | MC | 31.08.2016 | MK | 31.08.2016 | NL | 31.08.2016 | PL | 31.08.2016 | RO | 31.08.2016 | RS | 31.08.2016 | SE | 31.08.2016 | SI | 31.08.2016 | SK | 31.08.2016 | SM | 31.08.2016 | TR | 31.08.2016 | IE | 06.09.2016 | LU | 06.09.2016 | MT | 30.09.2016 | BG | 30.11.2016 | NO | 30.11.2016 | GR | 01.12.2016 | PT | 02.01.2017 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 06.09.2013 | |
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IS | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
MK | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
TR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IE | 06.09.2016 | ||
LU | 06.09.2016 | ||
MT | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | HU | 06.09.2013 | |
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IS | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
MK | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
IE | 06.09.2016 | ||
LU | 06.09.2016 | ||
MT | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | HU | 06.09.2013 | |
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IS | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
MK | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
IE | 06.09.2016 | ||
LU | 06.09.2016 | ||
MT | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 06.09.2013 | |
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IS | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
MK | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
IE | 06.09.2016 | ||
LU | 06.09.2016 | ||
MT | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 06.09.2013 | |
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IS | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
MK | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
IE | 06.09.2016 | ||
LU | 06.09.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
IE | 06.09.2016 | ||
LU | 06.09.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
IE | 06.09.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
IE | 06.09.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 31.08.2016 | |
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 31.08.2016 | |
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 31.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2007067476 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * * abstract * * claims 4,16 *; | [A]WO2008095050 (PHARMACYCLICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * * abstract * * claims 1-5 *; | [T]WO2013158984 (ACETYLON PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [T] * the whole document * * page 12, line 24 - page 14, line 7 ** claim 16 *; | [AD] - STIMSON L ET AL, "Biomarkers for predicting clinical responses to HDAC inhibitors", CANCER LETTERS, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 280, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.CANLET.2009.03.016, ISSN 0304-3835, (20090808), pages 177 - 183, (20090410), XP026146050 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.canlet.2009.03.016 | by applicant | US4328245 | US4409239 | US4410545 | US4977138 | JPH0764872 | US6350458 | WO0220817 | WO2006129105 | US2009209616 | US7608280 | US7611724 | US2010093610 | WO2010047714 | US2012046442 | - FOTHERINGHAM ET AL., CANCER CELL, (2009), vol. 15, page 57 | - KHAN ET AL., PNAS, (2010), vol. 107, page 6532 | - SHAO ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (2010), vol. 127, page 2199 | - BOLDEN ET AL., NATURE REVIEWS DRUG DISCOVERY, (2006), vol. 5, page 769 | - PEART ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (2003), vol. 63, page 4460 | - NEWBOLD ET AL., MOL. CANCER THER., (2008), vol. 7, page 1066 | - SCALA ET AL., MOLECULAR PHARMACOLOGY, (1997), vol. 51, page 1024 | - XIAO ET AL., J PHARMACOL AND EXP THER, (2005), vol. 313, page 268 | - BATES ET AL., BR JHAEMATOL, (2010), vol. 148, page 256 | - STIMSON ET AL., CANCER LETT, (2009), vol. 280, page 177 | - SASAKAWA ET AL., BIOCHEM PHARMACOL, (2005), vol. 69, page 603 | - PIEKARZ ET AL., BLOOD, (2004), vol. 103, page 4636 | - SANDOR ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES, (2002), vol. 8, page 718 | - MARSHALL ET AL., J EXP THER ONCOL, (2002), vol. 2, page 325 | - PIEKARZ ET AL., BLOOD, (2001), vol. 98, page 2865 | - PIEKARZ ET AL., J. CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, (2009), vol. 27, no. 32, page 5410 | - WHITTAKER ET AL., J CLIN ONCOL, (2010), vol. 28, pages 4485 - 4491 | - KIM ET AL., BIOCHERN AND BIOPHYS RES COMM, (2010), vol. 392, page 448 | - JUNG ET AL., LAB INVEST, (2008), vol. 88, page 153 | - KIM ET AL., CANCER RES, (2006), vol. 66, page 7490 | - EPPING ET AL., NATURE CELL BIOL, (2011), vol. 13, page 102 | - BRADNER ET AL., NAT CHEM BIOL, (2010), vol. 6, page 238 | - MANFRED E. WOLFF, Burger's Medicinal Chemistry and Drug Discovery, (1995), vol. 172-178, pages 949 - 982 | - GLOVER,, DNA Cloning, (1985), vol. I, II | - Immunochemical Methods in Cell and Molecular Biology, ACADEMIC PRESS | - WEIR AND BLACKWELL,, Handbook o.fExperimental Immunology, (1986), vol. I-IV | - KAHN ET AL., J AM. CHEM. SOC., (1996), vol. 118, pages 7237 - 7238 | - NAKAJIMA ET AL., EXP CELL RES, (1998), vol. 241, pages 126 - 133 | - AEROS1L® 200, W.R. GRACE CO. | - CAB-O-SIL®, CABOT CO. | - CAB-O- SIL@, CABOT CO. | - HAMBURGER AW; SALMON SE, "Primary bioassay of human tumor stem cells", SCIENCE, (1977), vol. 197, page 461 |