EP2831670 - METHOD, APPARATUS AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR IMAGE STABILIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2017 | Change - priority | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2015/32] |
Former [2015/06] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MISHRA, Pranav RA402 Purva Riviera Whitefield Road Marthahalli Karnataka, Bangalore 560037 / IN | [2015/06] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2015/06] | Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 13770141.3 | 04.03.2013 | WO2013FI50231 | Priority number, date | IN2012CHE1126 | 26.03.2012 Original published format: IN 1126CH2012 | [2017/16] |
Former [2015/06] | IN2012CHE1126 | 26.03.2012 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013144427 | Date: | 03.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2831670 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 03.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G03B5/00, H04N5/232, G06T5/00 | [2015/06] | CPC: |
H04N23/682 (EP,US);
H04N23/683 (US);
H04N23/681 (US);
G03B2205/0007 (EP,US);
G03B2217/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT ZUR BILDSTABILISIERUNG | [2015/06] | English: | METHOD, APPARATUS AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR IMAGE STABILIZATION | [2015/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET PRODUIT PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR POUR UNE STABILISATION D'IMAGE | [2015/06] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 22.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/06] | 21.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/51] | 26.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2004205802 (NIKON CORP) [Y] 10,11 * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0116] *; | [XYI]US2009244300 (LEVIN ANAT [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-9,12-15 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0033] * * claim 2 * [Y] 10,11 [I] 5; | [A]US2009252488 (EROMAKI MARKO [FI], et al) [A] 5* paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0072] *; | [X]US2012062787 (MUIJS REMCO THEODORUS JOHANNES [NL], et al) [X] 1,4,12,15 * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0109] - paragraph [0111] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0042] * | International search | [X]US2006291844 (KAKKORI HANNU [FI]); | [X]US2009244300 (LEVIN ANAT [US], et al); | [X]US2010245602 (WEBSTER STEVEN DAVID [AU], et al); | [X]US2010259670 (MOHAN ANKIT [US], et al); | [X]US2012062787 (MUIJS REMCO THEODORUS JOHANNES [NL], et al); | [X] - BANDO, Y. ET AL., "Motion Deblurring from a Single Image using Circular Sensor Motion. Computer Graphies Forum", PROCEEDINGS OF PACIFIC GRAPHIES 2011, (2011), vol. 30, no. 7, pages 1869 - 1878, XP055162546 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1467-8659.2011.02057.x |