EP2833957 - THERAPY FOR KIDNEY DISEASE AND/OR HEART FAILURE BY INTRADERMAL INFUSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Capricor Therapeutics, Inc. 8840 Wilshire Boulevard 2nd Floor Beverly Hills CA 90211 / US | [2015/16] |
Former [2015/07] | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 710 Medtronic Parkway N.E. Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DONOVAN, Maura 459 Woodlawn Avenue St. Paul, MN 55105 / US | 02 /
VAN ANTWERP, William, J.L. 26833 Pinehurst Drive Valencia, CA 91355 / US | 03 /
WIENEKE, Chad, A. 15395 55th Court N Plymouth, MN 55443 / US | 04 /
KAYTOR, Mike 1859 Burr Street Maplewood, MN 55117 / US | 05 /
GROVENDER, Eric 1728 Knox Avenue South Minneapolis, MN 55403 / US | [2015/07] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/07] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 13772548.7 | 15.03.2013 | WO2013US32448 | Priority number, date | US201261619413P | 02.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261619413 P | [2015/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013151767 | Date: | 10.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2833957 | Date: | 11.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61M37/00, A61M5/142, A61K38/22, C07K14/58, A61M5/168 | [2015/47] | CPC: |
A61K38/2242 (EP,US);
A61M37/0015 (US);
A61M5/14244 (EP,US);
A61M5/16854 (EP,US);
A61M2037/0023 (EP,US);
A61M2037/0061 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3334 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3344 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3355 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3561 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3584 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3592 (EP,US);
A61M2205/50 (EP,US);
A61M2205/52 (EP,US);
A61M2209/01 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/07] | A61M37/00, A61M5/142, A61K38/22, C07K14/58 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/07] | Title | German: | THERAPIE FÜR NIERENERKRANKUNGEN UND/ODER HERZINSUFFIZIENZ DURCH INTRADERMALE INFUSION | [2015/07] | English: | THERAPY FOR KIDNEY DISEASE AND/OR HEART FAILURE BY INTRADERMAL INFUSION | [2015/07] | French: | THÉRAPIE POUR UNE MALADIE RÉNALE ET/OU UNE INSUFFISANCE CARDIAQUE PAR PERFUSION INTRADERMIQUE | [2015/07] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2014 | Search fee paid | 02.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/07] | 01.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/10] | 29.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002188245 (MARTIN FRANK E [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract ** figure - *; | [XI]WO2008008845 (MICROCHIPS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,8,9,14,16,17 * abstract * * claims 3,4,15 * * paragraphs [0115] , [0144] * [I] 2-7,10-13,15; | [I]WO2011116388 (NANOSTAR HEALTH CORP [US], et al) [I] 1-17 * claim - * * figure - * | International search | [A]WO9513838 (ELAN MED TECH [IE], et al); | [A]US2008234656 (PETTIS RONALD J [US], et al); | [A]US2009012494 (YESHURUN YEHOSHUA [IL], et al); | [A]US2009259176 (YAIRI MICAH B [US]); | [A]WO2010113159 (MEDINGO LTD [IL], et al) |