EP2835969 - DECODING APPARATUS, DECODING METHOD, ENCODING APPARATUS AND ENCODING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.10.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2015/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKURAI Hironari c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
NAKAGAMI Ohji c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
TAKAHASHI Yoshitomo c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 04 /
SUZUKI Teruhiko c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2015/07] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/07] | Jackson, Jonathan Andrew D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 13772798.8 | 27.03.2013 | WO2013JP59134 | Priority number, date | JP20120087870 | 06.04.2012 Original published format: JP 2012087870 | JP20120135222 | 14.06.2012 Original published format: JP 2012135222 | [2015/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013150944 | Date: | 10.10.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2835969 | Date: | 11.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00, H04N19/46, H04N19/597 | [2015/37] | CPC: |
H04N19/46 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/597 (EP,CN,US);
H04N13/161 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/07] | H04N7/26, H04N13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/07] | Title | German: | DECODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, DECODIERUNGSVERFAHREN, CODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND CODIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2015/07] | English: | DECODING APPARATUS, DECODING METHOD, ENCODING APPARATUS AND ENCODING METHOD | [2015/07] | French: | APPAREIL DE DÉCODAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCODAGE, APPAREIL DE CODAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE | [2015/07] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2014 | Translation filed | 29.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/07] | 26.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/11] | 06.10.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/11] | 25.10.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2362664 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0052] *; | [X]WO2012001606 (SISVEL TECHNOLOGY SRL [IT], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 4, line 23 - page 5, line 23 * * page 7, line 7 - line 9 *; | [X]US2012020413 (CHEN YING [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US2012033039 (SASAKI TAIJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0113] *; | [XP] - NAKAGAMI O ET AL, "2D compatible frame packing arrangement SEI", 10. JCT-VC MEETING; 101. MPEG MEETING; 11-7-2012 - 20-7-2012; STOCKHOLM; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20120629), no. JCTVC-J0070, XP030112432 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO2010085361 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR], et al); | [Y]JP2010268433 (SONY CORP); | [X]JP2011109397 (SONY CORP) |