EP2787589 - LIGHTNING PROTECTION CIRCUIT, SWITCHING POWER SUPPLY AND LIGHTNING PROTECTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Device Co., Ltd. Building B2 Huawei Industrial Base Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2014/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Liangang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
DI, Wei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
ZOU, Mei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
PU, Yiyong Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2014/41] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2016/43] |
Former [2014/41] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 13773092.5 | 01.04.2013 | [2016/43] | WO2013CN73586 | Priority number, date | CN20121096080 | 01.04.2012 Original published format: CN201210096080 | [2014/41] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013149575 | Date: | 10.10.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2787589 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2787589 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02H9/06, H02H7/12, // H02H7/04 | [2015/03] | CPC: |
H02H7/12 (EP,US);
H02H9/06 (EP,US);
H01F27/343 (US);
H02G13/80 (US);
H02H3/20 (US);
H02H7/04 (EP,US);
H05B41/2851 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/41] | H02H9/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BLITZSCHUTZSCHALTUNG, SCHALTNETZTEIL UND BLITZSCHUTZVERFAHREN | [2014/41] | English: | LIGHTNING PROTECTION CIRCUIT, SWITCHING POWER SUPPLY AND LIGHTNING PROTECTION METHOD | [2014/41] | French: | CIRCUIT DE PROTECTION CONTRE LA FOUDRE, ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE À COMMUTATION, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PROTECTION CONTRE LA FOUDRE | [2014/41] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2014 | Translation filed | 30.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/41] | 22.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.04.2013 | AL | 26.10.2016 | AT | 26.10.2016 | CY | 26.10.2016 | CZ | 26.10.2016 | DK | 26.10.2016 | EE | 26.10.2016 | ES | 26.10.2016 | FI | 26.10.2016 | HR | 26.10.2016 | LT | 26.10.2016 | LV | 26.10.2016 | MC | 26.10.2016 | MK | 26.10.2016 | PL | 26.10.2016 | RO | 26.10.2016 | RS | 26.10.2016 | SE | 26.10.2016 | SI | 26.10.2016 | SK | 26.10.2016 | SM | 26.10.2016 | TR | 26.10.2016 | BG | 26.01.2017 | NO | 26.01.2017 | GR | 27.01.2017 | IS | 26.02.2017 | PT | 27.02.2017 | LU | 01.04.2017 | MT | 01.04.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 01.04.2013 | |
AT | 26.10.2016 | ||
CY | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
MK | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
TR | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
LU | 01.04.2017 | ||
MT | 01.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 01.04.2013 | |
AT | 26.10.2016 | ||
CY | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
MK | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
LU | 01.04.2017 | ||
MT | 01.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 01.04.2013 | |
AT | 26.10.2016 | ||
CY | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
LU | 01.04.2017 | ||
MT | 01.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 01.04.2013 | |
AT | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
LU | 01.04.2017 | ||
MT | 01.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
LU | 01.04.2017 | ||
MT | 01.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
LU | 01.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 26.10.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5892669 (SHIN KI-HO [KR]) [X] 1,5,6 * the whole document * [I] 2-4; | [A]GB2342516 (BOWTHORPE IND LTD [GB]) [A] 1,2,6 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH1028322 (OODETSUKUSU KK, et al); | [A]CN201278411Y (ZTE CORP [CN]); | [A]CN201440607U (CHINA GREAT WALL COMP SHENZHEN); | [A]CN101719655 (INSPUR ELECTRONIC INFORMATION); | [A]CN202076780U (SHENZHEN HUNTKEY CHIYUAN ELECTRICS CO LTD); | [A]CN202111470U (DONGGUAN CITY YINGJU ELECTRONICS CO LTD) |