EP2896278 - DEVICE FOR GENERATING PLASMA HAVING A HIGH RANGE ALONG AN AXIS BY ELECTRON CYCLOTRON RESONANCE (ECR) FROM A GASEOUS MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H.E.F. Rue Benoît Fourneyron 42160 Andrezieux-Boutheon / FR | [2015/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIDT, Beat 27 Bis rue de Roanne F-42210 Montrond Les Bains / FR | 02 /
HEAU, Christophe 22 Rue Voltaire F-42100 Saint Etienne / FR | 03 /
MAURIN-PERRIER, Philippe 564 Route de Saint Romain F-42680 Saint Marcellin en Forez / FR | [2015/30] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Laurent & Charras 3 place de l'Hotel de Ville CS 70203 42005 Saint-Etienne Cedex 1 / FR | [2019/24] |
Former [2015/30] | Cabinet Laurent & Charras 3 Place de l'Hotel de Ville CS 70203 42005 Saint Etienne Cedex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13774719.2 | 04.09.2013 | [2019/24] | WO2013FR52035 | Priority number, date | FR20120058495 | 11.09.2012 Original published format: FR 1258495 | [2015/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014041280 | Date: | 20.03.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2896278 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2896278 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H05H1/46, H01J37/32 | [2015/30] | CPC: |
H01J37/32192 (EP,US);
H01J37/32009 (US);
H01J37/32678 (EP,US);
H05H1/46 (EP,US);
H05H1/463 (EP,US);
H01J37/32 (RU)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR PLASMAERZEUGUNG MIT HOHEM BEREICH ENTLANG EINER ACHSE DURCH ELEKTRONZYKLOTRONRESONANZ (ECR) AUS EINEM GASFÖRMIGEN MEDIUM | [2015/30] | English: | DEVICE FOR GENERATING PLASMA HAVING A HIGH RANGE ALONG AN AXIS BY ELECTRON CYCLOTRON RESONANCE (ECR) FROM A GASEOUS MEDIUM | [2015/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR GÉNÉRER UN PLASMA PRÉSENTANT UNE ÉTENDUE IMPORTANTE LE LONG D'UN AXE PAR RÉSONNANCE CYCLOTRONIQUE ÉLECTRONIQUE RCE À PARTIR D'UN MILIEU GAZEUX. | [2019/03] |
Former [2015/30] | DISPOSITIF POUR GENERER UN PLASMA PRESENTANT UNE ETENDUE IMPORTANTE LE LONG D'UN AXE PAR RESONNANCE CYCLOTRONIQUE ELECTRONIQUE RCE A PARTIR D'UN MILIEU GAZEUX. | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/30] | 30.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.01.2019 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.06.2019 | CY | 12.06.2019 | EE | 12.06.2019 | HR | 12.06.2019 | MC | 12.06.2019 | MK | 12.06.2019 | MT | 12.06.2019 | RS | 12.06.2019 | SM | 12.06.2019 | IE | 04.09.2019 | LU | 04.09.2019 | GR | 13.09.2019 | IS | 12.10.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CY | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
MT | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 04.09.2019 | ||
LU | 04.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CY | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 04.09.2019 | ||
LU | 04.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 04.09.2019 | ||
LU | 04.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
LU | 04.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US4745337 (PICHOT MICHEL [FR], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 2, lines 41-51 * * column 4, lines 35-55 * * column 5, lines 34-66 * [Y] 4,9 [I] 3; | [A]US5961773 (ICHIMURA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11* abstract *; | [IY]WO2008009558 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [I] 1 * abstract * * page 12, lines 27-30 * [Y] 4,9; | [A]EP1976346 (ECOLE POLYTECH [FR], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | by applicant | DE4136297 | DE19812558 | EP1075168 | WO2005027595 | WO2008017304 |