EP2893087 - MANHOLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/29] | MANHOLE | ||
[2017/52] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.06.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EJ EMEA Z.I. de Marivaux 60149 Saint-Crépin-Ibouvillers / FR | [2015/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VINET, Bertrand 10 rue Antoine Caron F-60000 Beauvais / FR | [2015/29] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/29] | Thinat, Michel Cabinet Weinstein 176 avenue Charles de Gaulle 92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | Application number, filing date | 13774721.8 | 04.09.2013 | WO2013FR52038 | Priority number, date | FR20120058302 | 05.09.2012 Original published format: FR 1258302 | [2015/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014037669 | Date: | 13.03.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2893087 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E02D29/14 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
E02D29/1427 (EP);
E02D29/1463 (EP,CN);
E02D2600/20 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] | Title | German: | MANNLOCH | [2022/11] | English: | MANHOLE | [2022/11] | French: | REGARD DE CHAUSSEE | [2017/52] |
Former [2015/29] | SCHACHT | ||
Former [2015/29] | MANHOLE | ||
Former [2015/29] | REGARD DE CHAUSSÉE | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 01.07.2016 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 29.07.2016 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 22.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9835107 (LAD TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-13* the whole document * | by applicant | FR2758836 |