EP2836256 - SELF-INJECTION DEVICE WITH INDICATOR FOR INDICATING PROPER CONNECTION OF COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US | [2016/49] |
Former [2015/08] | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNEIDER, Jared 60 Brookwood Road Cranston, Rhode Island 02910 / US | 02 /
GUARRAIA, Mark 1404 Narragansett Blvd Cranston, Rhode Island 02905 / US | 03 /
BOYAVAL, Margaux 29 South Atlantic Avenue Warwick, Rhode Island 02888 / US | 04 /
SHAFER, Ryan 981 Marston Road Whitinsville, Massachusetts 01588 / US | [2015/08] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2019/23] |
Former [2015/08] | Von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 13775472.7 | 12.04.2013 | [2019/23] | WO2013US36405 | Priority number, date | US201261624218P | 13.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261624218 P | [2015/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013155435 | Date: | 17.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2836256 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2836256 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/178, A61M5/20, A61M5/24, A61M5/31, A61M5/315 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
A61M5/24 (EP,CN,US);
A61M5/178 (RU);
A61M5/20 (EP,CN,US);
A61M5/3155 (CN,US);
A61M2005/2006 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2005/2403 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2005/2485 (CN,US);
A61M2005/2488 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3126 (CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/08] | A61M5/178 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELBSTINJEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM INDIKATOR ZUR ANZEIGE DER KORREKTEN VERBINDUNG VON BAUTEILEN | [2015/08] | English: | SELF-INJECTION DEVICE WITH INDICATOR FOR INDICATING PROPER CONNECTION OF COMPONENTS | [2015/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AUTO-INJECTION AVEC INDICATEUR DE RACCORDEMENT CORRECT DES COMPOSANTS | [2015/08] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2014 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/08] | 16.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.01.2019 | 05.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19168374.7 / EP3533483 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.09.2017 | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.04.2013 | AL | 05.06.2019 | AT | 05.06.2019 | CY | 05.06.2019 | CZ | 05.06.2019 | DK | 05.06.2019 | EE | 05.06.2019 | FI | 05.06.2019 | HR | 05.06.2019 | LT | 05.06.2019 | LV | 05.06.2019 | MC | 05.06.2019 | MK | 05.06.2019 | MT | 05.06.2019 | NL | 05.06.2019 | PL | 05.06.2019 | RO | 05.06.2019 | RS | 05.06.2019 | SE | 05.06.2019 | SI | 05.06.2019 | SK | 05.06.2019 | SM | 05.06.2019 | TR | 05.06.2019 | BG | 05.09.2019 | NO | 05.09.2019 | GR | 06.09.2019 | IS | 05.10.2019 | PT | 07.10.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 12.04.2013 | |
AL | 05.06.2019 | ||
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CY | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
MT | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 05.06.2019 | |
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 05.06.2019 | |
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]WO2011039209 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE], et al) [X] 1,7,9,10 * page 15, line 1 - page 18, line 8 * [A] 3 [Y] 2,4-6,8; | [YA]WO2011039211 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE], et al) [Y] 2,8 * page 25, line 21 - page 26, line 16; figures 17A-17C * [A] 1,7,9,10; | [XA]WO2011039228 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE], et al) [X] 1 * page 10, line 1 - page 12, line 19; figure 2 * [A] 2,3,7-10; | [A]WO9938554 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [A] 1-3,7-10 * the whole document *; | [E]EP2774640 (TEVA PHARMA [IL]) [E] 1 * paragraph [0051] *; | [XYI]DE202008011175U (HASELMEIER GMBH [CH]) [X] 11,13 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0026] * [Y] 4-6 [I] 12,14,15; | [X]WO2007107431 (SHL MEDICAL AB [SE], et al) [X] 11 * paragraph [0046]; figure 5 *; | [A]WO9964092 (OWEN MUMFORD LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1 * figure 4 *; | [A]DE102007018696 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 4 * | International search | [X]US2011313350 (KRULEVITCH PETER [US], et al); | [Y]US2010160894 (JULIAN JOSEPH F [US], et al); | [Y]US2009157041 (PETTIS RONALD J [US], et al); | [Y]US2009069752 (RAJ ABHIJITSINH S [US], et al) | Examination | WO2011039219 | WO2010139629 | WO2010112558 | by applicant | US2006229562 |