EP2906299 - COSMETIC COMPOSITION FOR COATING KERATIN FIBRES COMPRISING A HARD WAX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2019 [2019/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'OREAL 14 rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [2015/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ILEKTI, Philippe 9 rue Marceau F-94700 Maisons-Alfort / FR | [2015/34] | Representative(s) | Goudet, Sylvain L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/34] | Goudet, Sylvain L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 13776785.1 | 11.10.2013 | [2015/34] | WO2013EP71289 | Priority number, date | FR20120059805 | 15.10.2012 Original published format: FR 1259805 | [2015/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014060308 | Date: | 24.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2906299 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q1/10, A61K8/60, A61K8/92, A61K8/04 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
A61K8/044 (EP,US);
A61K8/60 (EP,US);
A61K8/922 (EP,US);
A61Q1/10 (EP,US);
A61K2800/52 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/34] | Title | German: | KOSMETISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BESCHICHTUNG VON KERATINFASERN MIT EINEM HARTWACHS | [2015/34] | English: | COSMETIC COMPOSITION FOR COATING KERATIN FIBRES COMPRISING A HARD WAX | [2015/34] | French: | COMPOSITION COSMÉTIQUE POUR REVÊTIR DES FIBRES DE KÉRATINE COMPRENANT UNE CIRE DURE | [2015/34] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/34] | 23.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/16] | 06.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.10.2016 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 23.06.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 23.06.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.07.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2007280979 (SHINOHARA SHIGEO [JP], et al) [X] 1-16 * examples 2-3 *; | [X]JP2010254670 (KOSE CORP) [X] 1-16 * examples 5,17-24,27-29 *; | [X]JP2005068056 (KOSE CORP) [X] 1-16 * examples 1-3; table 1 *; | [X]JPH10298064 (TOWA YAKUHIN KK) [X] 1-16 * examples 1-3 * | by applicant | FR2687569 | FR2815849 | US2003185774 | US5188899 | US5874069 | US5919441 | US6051216 | US5981680 | WO2007068371 | WO2008155059 | FR2968978 | - GRIFFIN, J. SOC. COSM. CHEM., (1954), vol. 5, pages 249 - 256 | - Kirk-Othmer Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, WILEY, (1979), vol. 22, pages 333 - 432 | - C.M. HANSEN, "The three- dimensional solubility parameters", J. PAINT TECHNOL., (1967), vol. 39, page 105 |