EP2844041 - POWER SUPPLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Gpoint Tech Company Limited 1st Floor, Building A3 Gaodeng industrail park No. 168 Changshan Industrial Park Liulian Community, Pingdi Street, Longgang District, Shenzhen 518000 Guangdong Province / CN | [2015/35] |
Former [2015/10] | For all designated states Shenzhen Gpoint Tech Company Limited 14B Tower B Caifu Square Shennan Road Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Hongzhi 14B Tower B Caifu Square Shennan Road Futian District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | 02 /
XIE, Yongxian 14B Tower B Caifu Square Shennan Road Futian District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2015/10] | Representative(s) | Delumeau, François Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/10] | Delumeau, François Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13777587.0 | 07.03.2013 | WO2013CN72304 | Priority number, date | CN201210121962 | 18.04.2012 Original published format: CN201210121962 | CN201210260461 | 16.07.2012 Original published format: CN201210260461 | CN201220361274U | 16.07.2012 Original published format: CN 201220361274 U | [2015/10] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013155904 | Date: | 24.10.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2844041 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/02, H05B33/08, G05F1/575, H02J1/04, H02J1/14 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
H05B45/46 (EP,US);
H02J1/14 (US);
G05F1/575 (US);
H02J1/04 (US);
Y02B20/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/10] | H05B37/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/10] | Title | German: | NETZTEIL | [2015/10] | English: | POWER SUPPLY | [2015/10] | French: | ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE | [2015/10] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2014 | Translation filed | 18.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2014 | Search fee paid | 18.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 31.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/06] | 24.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2007139317 (MARTEL ALAIN [CA], et al) [I] 1,2,4-6,15-20 * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0070]; figures 2-4 * [Y] 3,12-14; | [Y]WO2010122463 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 3 * page 3, paragraph 3; figure 2 *; | [XYI]US2011080115 (GE LIANGAN [CN], et al) [X] 1,2,7-11 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0027]; figures 4-6 * [Y] 3,12-14 [I] 5,6,15-20; | [Y]US2011148314 (LIN LI-WEI [TW], et al) [Y] 12 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028]; figures 3, 4A *; | [Y]WO2011150631 (INVENTRONICS HANGZHOU CO LTD [CN], et al) [Y] 13,14 * abstract *; | EP2579688 [ ] (INVENTRONICS HANGZHOU INC [CN]) [ ] * paragraph [0041] * | International search | [X]JP2006174677 (OLYMPUS CORP); | [Y]CN201374835Y (ZHENG ZHANG); | [X]CN101674693 (INVENTRONICS HANGZHOU CO LTD); | [X]CN201550320U (INVENTRONICS HANGZHOU CO LTD); | [X]CN201708995U (LED ONE HANGZHOU CO LTD); | [Y]CN201904957U (HUI XU); | [X]CN201919217U (INVENTRONICS HANGZHOU CO LTD); | [X]CN102264173 (INVENTRONICS (HANGZHOU) CO., LTD.); | [X]CN202083974U (INVENTRONICS HANGZHOU CO LTD); | [X]CN202085342U (INVENTRONICS HANGZHOU CO LTD); | [Y]CN202121834U (JILIN PROVINCIAL COMM SCIENT RES INST); | [XP]CN102856892 (SHENZHEN VERTEX ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [XP]CN202696134U (GOLDEN POINT ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY COMPANY LTD) |