EP2802027 - ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY INCLUDING DIFFERENTLY SHAPED POSITIVE ELECTRODE AND NEGATIVE ELECTRODE, AND SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2018/38] |
Former [2014/46] | For all designated states LG CHEM, LTD. 20 Yoido-dong Youngdunpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIM, Soo Hyun 1511 Yuseong Hanjin Resort Officetel Bongmyeong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-301 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Min Hee 101-2405 Halla Sigma Paelris Ingye-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-827 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Jae Hyun 503-603 Banseokmaeul 5-danji Apt. Banseok-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-749 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Seong Min 244 Sinsu-dong Mapo-gu Seoul 121-856 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Jihyun 108-1001 Hanwa Ggumegreen Apt. Gwanpyeong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-741 / KR | 06 /
PARK, Tae Jin A-1001 LG Chem Sawon Apt. Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-340 / KR | [2014/46] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2018/22] |
Former [2014/46] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13777711.6 | 16.04.2013 | [2018/22] | WO2013KR03205 | Priority number, date | KR20120039351 | 16.04.2012 Original published format: KR 20120039351 | KR20120039246 | 16.04.2012 Original published format: KR 20120039246 | [2014/46] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013157827 | Date: | 24.10.2013 | Language: | KO | [2013/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2802027 | Date: | 12.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2802027 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/26, H01M2/30, H01M10/6553, H01M2/16, H01M4/485, H01M4/505, H01M4/525, H01M10/0525 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
H01M10/6553 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/531 (KR);
H01M50/533 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/654 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/131 (KR);
H01M4/485 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/505 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/525 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/46 (KR,US);
H01M50/54 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/543 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2015/38] | H01M2/26, H01M2/30, H01M10/6553, H01M2/16 | ||
Former IPC [2014/46] | H01M2/26, H01M2/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRODENANORDNUNG MIT UNTERSCHIEDLICH GEFORMTEN POSITIVELEKTRODEN UND NEGATIVELEKTRODEN SOWIE SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2014/46] | English: | ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY INCLUDING DIFFERENTLY SHAPED POSITIVE ELECTRODE AND NEGATIVE ELECTRODE, AND SECONDARY BATTERY | [2014/46] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'ÉLECTRODES COMPRENANT UNE ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE ET UNE ÉLECTRODE NÉGATIVE DE FORMES DIFFÉRENTES, ET BATTERIE RECHARGEABLE | [2014/46] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2014 | Translation filed | 07.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2014 | Search fee paid | 07.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/46] | 02.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.04.2013 | AL | 30.05.2018 | AT | 30.05.2018 | CY | 30.05.2018 | CZ | 30.05.2018 | DK | 30.05.2018 | EE | 30.05.2018 | ES | 30.05.2018 | FI | 30.05.2018 | HR | 30.05.2018 | IT | 30.05.2018 | LT | 30.05.2018 | LV | 30.05.2018 | MC | 30.05.2018 | MK | 30.05.2018 | MT | 30.05.2018 | NL | 30.05.2018 | PL | 30.05.2018 | RO | 30.05.2018 | RS | 30.05.2018 | SE | 30.05.2018 | SI | 30.05.2018 | SK | 30.05.2018 | SM | 30.05.2018 | TR | 30.05.2018 | BG | 30.08.2018 | NO | 30.08.2018 | GR | 31.08.2018 | IS | 30.09.2018 | PT | 01.10.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 16.04.2013 | |
AL | 30.05.2018 | ||
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
MT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IS | 30.09.2018 | ||
PT | 01.10.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 16.04.2013 | |
AL | 30.05.2018 | ||
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IS | 30.09.2018 | ||
PT | 01.10.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IS | 30.09.2018 | ||
PT | 01.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
PT | 01.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 30.05.2018 | |
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6348283 (MAS JEAN-FRANCOIS [FR], et al) [X] 1,5,10,13,18 * col. 2, l. 62-66 * col. 3, l. 7-12, l. 21-22, l. 37-56;; figures 1-4 *; | [X]JP2005149882 (SII MICRO PARTS LTD) [X] 1,2,4-6,10,12,18 * paragraphs [0004] , [0014]; figures 1-4 *; | [X]EP1770801 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,8,10,11,18 * figures 3, 4,14,15 *; | [X]US2010323235 (TAKAMI NORIO [JP], et al) [X] 14-17* paragraphs [0030] , [0058] *; | [X]KR20100135382 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [X] 8,9 * figure 3a *; | [X]JP2011108534 (NEC ENERGY DEVICES LTD) [X] 1-7,10,18 * paragraphs [0027] , [0015]; figures 1,2,7,8 *; | [X]WO2011111556 (HITACHI MAXELL ENERGY LTD [JP], et al) [X] 8,10 * figures 6,7 * | International search | [Y]KR20040110921 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD); | [A]KR20080102606 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20080109948 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20100081508 (SB LIMOTIVE CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20110066632 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) | Examination | KR20080109948 | JP2012038495 |