EP2839421 - PROCESSING PAYMENT TRANSACTIONS WITHOUT A SECURE ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2017/45] |
Former [2015/09] | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOOSTE, Sarel, Kobus 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2015/09] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/09] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 13777837.9 | 09.04.2013 | WO2013US35865 | Priority number, date | US201261635277P | 18.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261635277 P | [2015/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013158419 | Date: | 24.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2839421 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/20, G06Q20/32, H04B5/02 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
G06Q20/326 (EP);
G06Q20/322 (KR);
G06Q20/3278 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06Q20/202 (US);
G06Q20/24 (KR);
G06Q20/363 (US);
G06Q20/367 (KR);
G06Q20/38 (KR);
G06Q20/387 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/09] | Title | German: | VERARBEITUNG VON ZAHLUNGSTRANSAKTIONEN OHNE EIN SICHERES ELEMENT | [2015/09] | English: | PROCESSING PAYMENT TRANSACTIONS WITHOUT A SECURE ELEMENT | [2015/09] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE TRANSACTIONS DE PAIEMENT SANS ÉLÉMENT SÉCURISÉ | [2015/09] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 25.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/09] | 30.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/26] | 26.07.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.05.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/26] | Appeal following examination | 22.09.2017 | Appeal received No. T0082/18 | 09.11.2017 | Statement of grounds filed | 01.02.2021 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2021/05] | 06.05.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.06.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2007114274 (GIBBS SIMON [US], et al); | [Y]KR100822160B ; | [A]KR20110010880 (OK YUN SUN [KR]); | [Y]US2011078079 (SHIN JI-HOON [KR]); | [A]KR20120011347 (BIZMODELINE CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | US2007114274 | KR100822160B | KR20110010880 | US2011078079 | KR20120011347 |